Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238491

EP1238491 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVE ENCRYPTION AND DECRYPTION OF POINT TO MULTI-POINT MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy Drive, MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
7001 Development Drive
Research Triangle Park, N.C. 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / IRVIN, David, R.
1546 Iredell Drive
Raleigh, NC 27608 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Lindgren, Anders , et al
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Lindgren, Anders , et al
Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344, Drottninggatan 7
751 43 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date00987971.927.10.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US29595
Priority number, dateUS1999046436315.12.1999         Original published format: US 464363
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0145317
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238491
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238491
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/08, H04Q7/38
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN VERSCHLÜSSELUNG UND ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG VON PUNKT-ZU-MEHRPUNKT NACHRICHTEN[2002/37]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVE ENCRYPTION AND DECRYPTION OF POINT TO MULTI-POINT MESSAGES[2002/37]
French:PROCEDES ET APPAREIL POUR LE CHIFFREMENT ET LE DECHIFFREMENT SELECTIFS DE MESSAGES POINT A MULTIPOINT[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2002National basic fee paid 
17.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
11.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2004Fee for grant paid
16.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Request for further processing for:11.10.2003Request for further processing filed
11.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
CY22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
FR22.09.2004
IT22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
IE27.10.2004
LU27.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
DK22.12.2004
GB22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
PT22.02.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
CY22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
FR22.09.2004
IT22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
IE27.10.2004
LU27.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
DK22.12.2004
GB22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2007/09]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
CY22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
FR22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
IE27.10.2004
LU27.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
DK22.12.2004
GB22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2006/32]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
FR22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
IE27.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
DK22.12.2004
GB22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2006/14]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
IE27.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
DK22.12.2004
GB22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2006/13]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
IE27.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
DK22.12.2004
GB22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/46]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
MC31.10.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/45]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
MC31.10.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/28]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/27]AT22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/21]AT22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/13]AT22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE22.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0944275  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5,9,10,12-18,24-31,34-39 * column 5, line 44 - line 54 * * column 6, line 27 - line 45 * * column 8, line 20 - line 31 * * column 13, line 23 - line 27 * * column 14, line 24 - line 35 * * column 16, line 32 - column 17, line 3 *;
 [A]US5987137  (KARPPANEN ARTO [FI], et al) [A] 1-4,9,12-14,16-18,24-31,34,35 * column 2, line 14 - line 31 * * column 6, line 18 - line 30 * * column 6, line 61 - line 67 * * column 9, line 29 - line 47 * * column 10, line 30 - line 41 * * figure 5A *
 [A]  - LI GONG ET AL, "MULTICAST SECURITY AND ITS EXTENSION TO A MOBILE ENVIRONMENT", WIRELESS NETWORKS,US,ACM, (19951001), vol. 1, no. 3, ISSN 1022-0038, pages 281 - 295, XP000538241 [A] 1,4,5,9,11-20,24,26-28,31,34-38 * abstract * * page 284, column L, line 37 - line 40 * * page 285, column L, line 8 - line 21 * * page 286, column L, line 49 - line 51 * * page 287, column L, line 53 - column R, line 3 * * page 293, column L, line 14 - line 30 * * page 293, column R, line 1 - line 15 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01200847