Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239842

EP1239842 - ELECTROSTATIC APPLICATION OF POWDER MATERIAL TO SOLID DOSAGE FORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phoqus Pharmaceuticals Limited
10 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill, West Malling
Kent ME19 4PQ / GB
[2007/08]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Phoqus Pharmaceuticals Limited
10 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill
West Malling, Kent ME19 4PQ / GB
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Phoqus Limited
10 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill
West Malling, Kent ME19 4PQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / REEVES, Linda Ann
31 Hatton Court, Lubbock Road
Chislehurst, Kent BR7 5JQ / GB
02 / FEATHER, David, Hoover
9899 Caminito Rogelio
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
03 / NELSON, Douglas, Howard
1849 Paseo del Lago Vista
Carlsbad, CA 92083 / US
04 / WHITEMAN, Marshall
39 Cherry Orchard
Ditton, Kent ME20 6QS / GB
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Bardo, Julian Eason , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Bardo, Julian Eason , et al
Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date00988070.915.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US33962
Priority number, dateGB1999002994617.12.1999         Original published format: GB 9929946
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0143727
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1239842
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239842
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/28, B05B5/08
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2007/06]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROSTATISCHER PULVERAUFTRAG AUF FESTE DOSIERUNGSFORMEN[2002/38]
English:ELECTROSTATIC APPLICATION OF POWDER MATERIAL TO SOLID DOSAGE FORMS[2002/38]
French:APPLICATION ELECTROSTATIQUE D'UN MATERIAU EN POUDRE SUR DES FORMES GALENIQUES SOLIDES[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2002National basic fee paid 
10.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
13.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
21.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
20.10.2006Fee for grant paid
20.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Request for further processing for:20.10.2006Request for further processing filed
20.10.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.01.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
TR21.02.2007
GR22.05.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/33]CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
GR22.05.2007
Former [2008/48]DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
GR22.05.2007
Former [2007/46]DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
Former [2007/36]FI21.02.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]US3961849  (JONES HUGH L) [A] 1,24,25,34 * column 3, line 8 - line 37; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS59125766  ;
 [A]US5006362  (HILBORN G ROLAND [US]) [A] 1,24,25,34 * column 4, line 19 - line 32 *;
 [A]US4106868  (OPHEY PETRUS J M) [A] 1,24,25,34 * column 2, line 27 - line 64; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2253164  (HOECHST UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1,24,25,34 * page 13, line 5 - line 27; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841121), vol. 008, no. 254, Database accession no. (P - 315), [A] 1,24,25,34 * abstract *
by applicantWO9214451
 WO9635516