Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259562

EP1259562 - STERICALLY HINDERED DERIVATIVES OF WATER SOLUBLE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2006
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nektar Therapeutics AL, Corporation
490 Discovery Drive
Huntsville, AL 35806-2902 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
Nektar Therapeutics Al, Corporation
490 Discovery Drive
Huntsville, AL 35806-2902 / US
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Shearwater Corporation
1112 Church Street Road
Hunstville, AL 35801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BENTLEY, Michael, David
4017 Nolen Ave., SE
Huntsville, AL 35801 / US
02 / ZHAO, Xuan
2805 Southhurst Dr., SE
Huntsville, AL 35803 / US
03 / GUO, Lihong
2805 Southhurst Dr., SE
Huntsville, AL 35803 / US
04 / SHEN, Xiaoming
215 Park Stone Dr.
Madison, AL 35758 / US
 [2005/01]
Former [2002/48]01 / BENTLEY, Michael, David
4017 Nolen Ave., SE
Huntsville, AL 35801 / US
02 / ZHAO, Xuan
2805 Southhurst Dr., SE
Huntsville, AL 25803 / US
03 / GUO, Lihong
2805 Southhurst Dr., SE
Huntsville, AL 35803 / US
04 / SHEN, Xiaoming
215 Park Stone Dr.
Madison, AL 35758 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/48]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00988240.820.12.2000
[2002/48]
WO2000US34793
Priority number, dateUS19990171784P22.12.1999         Original published format: US 171784 P
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146291
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259562
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259562
Date:15.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08G65/32, A61K47/48
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:STERISCH GEHINDERTE DERIVATE VON WASSERLÖSLICHEN POLYMEREN[2002/48]
English:STERICALLY HINDERED DERIVATIVES OF WATER SOLUBLE POLYMERS[2002/48]
French:DERIVES DE POLYMERES HYDROSOLUBLES A EMPECHEMENT STERIQUE[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2002National basic fee paid 
16.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
04.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2004Fee for grant paid
05.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT15.02.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9703106  (SHEARWATER POLYMERS INC ;HARRIS J MILTON (US); KOZLOWSKI ANTONI (U) [A] 1-31 * claims 1-19 *;
 [A]WO9945964  (SHEARWATER POLYMERS INC ;HARRIS J MILTON (US); KOZLOWSKI ANTONI (U) [A] 1-31 * claims 1-7 *
 [X]  - TOPCHIYEVA I N, "SYNTHESIS OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL DERIVATIVES. A REVIEW*", POLYMER SCIENCE USSR,GB,PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, (1990), vol. 32, no. 5, pages 833 - 851, XP000261916 [X] 1-7 * page 836, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3950(90)90214-Q
 [X]  - FRADET A ET AL, "Synthesis of Monocarboxylic Polyoxyethylenes.", POLYMER BULLETIN, (198102), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 205 - 210, XP002164805 [X] 1-7,24 * page 206, paragraph 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00256307