Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242148

EP1242148 - DISPENSING HEAD FOR A SQUEEZE DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emsar, Inc.
125 Access Road
Stratford, CT 06615 / US
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULTZ, Robert, S.
7 Heusted Drive
Old Greenwich, CT 06870 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Nachshen, Neil Jacob , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Nachshen, Neil Jacob , et al
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00988281.222.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US34989
Priority number, dateUS1999047089222.12.1999         Original published format: US 470892
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0145798
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242148
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242148
Date:26.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:B05B11/04
[2003/05]
Former International [2002/39]A62C11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
TitleGerman:SPENDERKOPF FÜR EINEN ZUSAMMENDRÜCKBAREN SPENDER[2002/39]
English:DISPENSING HEAD FOR A SQUEEZE DISPENSER[2002/39]
French:TETE DE DISTRIBUTION POUR DISTRIBUTEUR PRESSABLE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2002National basic fee paid 
19.07.2002Search fee paid 
19.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
12.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2005Fee for grant paid
07.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
CY26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
TR26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
IE22.12.2006
LU22.12.2006
PT26.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
TR26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
IE22.12.2006
LU22.12.2006
PT26.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/19]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
IE22.12.2006
PT26.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/48]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
IE22.12.2006
PT26.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/45]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/37]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/35]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/28]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/23]AT26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/22]CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/19]CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/12]CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/09]CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0528559  (EMSON RES [US]) [AD] 1,7 * column 3, line 24 - column 6, line 36; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3330446  (JACQUES GRUSSEN JEAN, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 65; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4453647  (NEAT BENJAMIN C [US]) [A] 12 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 18; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE19533134  (CHAPON [FR]) [A] 12 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4253588  (LESTER WILLIAM M, et al) [A] 12 * column 2, lines 20-63; figure 3 *
International search[XP]US6050504  (SCHULTZ ROBERT S [US], et al);
 [X]US4162749  (BENNETT ROBERT A [US]);
 [X]US4979648  (MONTGOMERY GARY V [US], et al)