Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242398

EP1242398 - PARTIALLY SATURATED CALCIUM CHANNEL BLOCKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2014
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2014  [2014/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zalicus Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Suite 301 2389 Health Services Mall
Vancouver, BC V6T 1Z4 / CA
[2011/01]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Neuromed Technologies, Inc.
Suite 301, 2389 Health Sciences Mall, The University Of British Columbia
Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SNUTCH, Terrance, P.
3963 West 24th Avenue
Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1M1 / CA
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Howard, Paul Nicholas , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/12]
Former [2002/39]Fisher, Adrian John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date00988532.820.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000CA01558
Priority number, dateUS19990172765P20.12.1999         Original published format: US 172765 P
US1999047692930.12.1999         Original published format: US 476929
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0146166
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1242398
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D295/02, C07D295/06, C07D295/18, C07D211/58, C07D211/32, A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61P9/00, A61P25/00, G01N33/50, G01N33/53
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEILWEISE GESÄTTIGTE CALCIUMKANAL-BLOCKER[2002/39]
English:PARTIALLY SATURATED CALCIUM CHANNEL BLOCKERS[2002/39]
French:INHIBITEURS CALCIQUES PARTIELLEMENT SATURES[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2002National basic fee paid 
05.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
12.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/49]
30.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.07.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
05.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201314   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5292726  (ASHTON WALLACE T [US], et al) [DX] 1-4,14,15,17 * abstract *;
 [DX]US5646149  (HELLBERG MARK R [US], et al) [DX] 1,14-17 * abstract * * column 11, table 5, 18th compound *;
 [DX]US5428038  (CHATTERJEE SHYAM S [DE], et al) [DX] 1,14-17 * column 1, line 19 - line 28; examples 8,14-17; claims 1,4,5; table 1 *;
 [DX]US5703071  (ITOH NORIIE [JP], et al) [DX] 1,17 * columns 39, 40, example no 13aB; column 2, line 10 - line 33; claims 1,2,4 *;
 [A]WO9943658  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * claims 1,26-29 *;
 [PX]US6011035  (SNUTCH TERRANCE PRESTON [CA], et al) [PX] 1-3,5,14,16,17 * claims 1,2; table 1 *
 [X]  - BREITENBUCHER J G ET AL, "Generation of a Piperazine-2-carboxamide Library: A Practical Application of the Phenol-Sulfide React and Release Linker", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19980312), vol. 39, no. 11, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 1295 - 1298, XP004107918 [X] 1,3,4,14,17 * page 1295, structural formula of "Draflazine" and text paragraph above *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)10870-X
 [AD]  - GOULD R J ET AL, "ANTISCHIZOPHRENIC DRUGS OF THE DIPHENYLBUTYLPIPERIDINE TYPE ACT AS CALCIUM CHANNEL ANTAGONISTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (198308), vol. 80, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5122 - 5125, XP000867760 [AD] 1-17 * page 5123, figure 1, especially "Lidoflazine" and "Penfluridol" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.80.16.5122
 [AD]  - KING V F ET AL, "SUBSTITUTED DIPHENYLBUTYLPIPERIDINES BIND TO A UNIQUE HIGH AFFINITYSITE ON THE L-TYPE CALCIUM CHANNEL", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, (19890405), vol. 264, no. 10, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 5633 - 5641, XP000867759 [AD] 1-17 * page 5633, abstract *
 [AD]  - GRANTHAM C J ET AL, "FLUSPIRILENE BLOCK OF N-TYPE CALCIUM CURRENT IN NGF-DIFFERENTIATED PC12 CELLS", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY,GB,BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, (1994), vol. 111, no. 2, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 483 - 488, XP000874810 [AD] 1-17 * page 483, abstract and "Introduction" *
by applicantUS5646149
 US5703071
 US5428038
    - MCCLESKEY, E.W. ET AL., CURR TOPICS MEMBR, (1991), vol. 39, pages 295 - 326,
    - DUNLAP, K. ET AL., TRENDS NEUROSCI, (1995), vol. 18, pages 89 - 98,
    - SATHER, W.A. ET AL., NEURON, (1995), vol. 11, pages 291 - 303,
    - STEA, A. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10576 - 10580,
    - BOURINET, E. ET AL., NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, (1999), vol. 2, pages 407 - 415,
    - STEA, A. ET AL., Handbook of Receptors and Channels, CRC PRESS,
    - PEREZ-REYES ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 896 - 900,
    - CRIBBS, L.L. ET AL., CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 83, pages 103 - 109,
    - LEE, J.H. ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (1999), vol. 19, pages 1912 - 1921,
    - GOULD, R.J. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 5122 - 5125,