EP1243030 - WHITE LIGHT SOURCE BASED ON NON-LINEAR OPTICAL PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2008/13] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Osram Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnitzstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Osram Opto Semiconductors GmbH Wernerwerkstrasse 2 93049 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPÄTH, Werner Burgstallerstrasse 10 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Rüdiger Ottilienweg 8 93128 Regenstauf / DE | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00988586.4 | 10.11.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000DE03957 | Priority number, date | DE1999163805 | 30.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19963805 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0150539 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243030 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243030 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L27/15 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H01L27/156 (EP,US);
G02F1/3532 (EP,US);
H01L33/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | WEISSLICHTQUELLE AUF DER BASIS NICHTLINEARER OPTISCHER PROZESSE | [2008/52] | English: | WHITE LIGHT SOURCE BASED ON NON-LINEAR OPTICAL PROCESSES | [2002/39] | French: | SOURCE DE LUMIERE BLANCHE SUR LA BASE DE PROCESSUS OPTIQUES NON LINEAIRES | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/39] | WEISSLICHTQUELLE AUF DER BASIS NICHTLINEAR-OPTISCHER PROZESSE | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 10.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5295143 (RAO RAMA [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0683595 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8-12 * page 12, line 12 - page 13, line 45 *; | [A]EP0767396 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * examples 6,8,12-5 *; | [A]DE19510423 (GSAENGER OPTOELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * the whole document * |