Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236292

EP1236292 - METHOD FOR REPRESENTING FORMAT INDICATOR BITS IN A FRAME TO BE SENT IN COMPRESSED MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SENNINGER, Christian
Gipsenweg 34
82515 Wolfratshausen / DE
02 / RAAF, Bernhard
Maxhofstrasse 62
81475 München / DE
 [2002/36]
Application number, filing date00988645.824.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000DE04177
Priority number, dateDE199915649224.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19956492
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0139397
Date:31.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236292
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236292
Date:26.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04Q7/38
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ABBILDEN VON FORMATKENNUNGS-BITS AUF EINEN IN EINEM KOMPRIMIERMODUS ZU SENDENDEN RAHMEN[2002/36]
English:METHOD FOR REPRESENTING FORMAT INDICATOR BITS IN A FRAME TO BE SENT IN COMPRESSED MODE[2002/36]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REPRESENTER DES BITS D'IDENTIFICATION DE FORMAT SUR UNE TRAME DEVANT ETRE ENVOYEE EN MODE COMPRIME[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase03.04.2002National basic fee paid 
03.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
24.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
24.10.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2006Fee for grant paid
20.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/35]IT26.04.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]  - "Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD)", 3G TS 25 212 VERSION 3.0.0, (199910), pages 37 - 50, XP002163232 [A] 1-27 * the whole document *