Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235867

EP1235867 - AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF ACRYLATE MODIFIED ALKYD RESINS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Coatings AG
Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
BASF Coatings Aktiengesellschaft
Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KADAMBANDE, Vijay
Hoffmann-von-Fallersleben-Weg 1
48165 Münster / DE
02 / RINK, Heinz-Peter
Lohöfener Weg 44
48153 Münster / DE
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Fitzner, Uwe , et al
Fitzner & Frese PartGmbB
Hauser Ring 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]Fitzner, Uwe , et al
Dres. Fitzner & Münch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hauser Ring 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
Former [2002/36]Fitzner, Uwe, Dr. , et al
Lintorfer Strasse 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date00988741.522.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000EP11616
Priority number, dateDE199915716127.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19957161
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0140336
Date:07.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1235867
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08F283/01, C08F285/00, C09D151/08, C09D167/07, C09D167/08
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE DISPERSIONEN ACRYLATMODIFIZIERTER ALKYDHARZE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2002/36]
English:AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF ACRYLATE MODIFIED ALKYD RESINS AND USE THEREOF[2002/36]
French:DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE RESINES ALKYDES A MODIFICATION ACRYLATE ET UTILISATION DESDITES DISPERSIONS[2003/30]
Former [2002/36]DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE RESINES ALKYDE A MODIFICATION ACRYLATE ET UTILISATION DESDITES DISPERSIONS
Entry into regional phase07.03.2002National basic fee paid 
07.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
11.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
05.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US3470126  (SEKMAKAS KAZYS, et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - * * examples IX,X *;
 [A]WO9533011  (BOLLIG & KEMPER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim - * * example 1 *