Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243121

EP1243121 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING A NETWORK TERMINAL IN AN ISDN TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.05.2006  [2006/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / HARINEN, Veli-Matti
Torpantie 95 A 1
FIN-90230 Oulu / FI
02 / MALO, Matti
Ohjaskuja 1 B 1
FIN-90540 Oulu / FI
 [2002/44]
Former [2002/39]01 / HARINEN, Veli-Matti
Kaitoväylä 28 A 24
FIN-90570 Oulu / FI
02 / MALO, Matti
Ohjaskuja 1 B 1
FIN-90540 Oulu / FI
Representative(s)Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi , et al
Papula Oy
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2004/03]Simmelvuo, Markku , et al
Papula Oy, P.O. Box 981
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2002/43]Sarajuuri, Mika Eerik , et al
Papula Oy, P.O. Box 981
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2002/39]Sarajuuri, Mika Eerik , et al
Oy Kolster Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date00988843.928.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000FI01154
Priority number, dateFI1999000283130.12.1999         Original published format: FI 992831
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0150718
Date:12.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243121
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE12.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/24, H04L29/08
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION EINES NETZWERKTERMINALS IN EINEM ISDN-TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2002/39]
English:A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING A NETWORK TERMINAL IN AN ISDN TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM[2002/39]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DETECTION D'UN TERMINAL RESEAU DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS RNIS[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2002National basic fee paid 
10.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
11.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
24.03.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19807532  (SCHNEIDER [DE]);
 [A]EP0550178  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US])