blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1242389

EP1242389 - NOVEL BRANCHED SUBSTITUTED AMINO DERIVATIVES OF 3-AMINO-1-PHENYL-1H[1,2,4]TRIAZOL, METHODS FOR PRODUCING THEM AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.11.2005  [2005/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
[2004/44]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
SANOFI-SYNTHELABO
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GESLIN, Michel
16, rue des Peupliers
F-31270 Villeneuve Tolosane / FR
02 / GULLY, Danielle
82, route de Roquettes
Saubens, 31600 Muret / FR
03 / MAFFRAND, Jean-Pierre
5, rue du Corps Franc Pomiès
F-31120 Portet sur Garonne / FR
04 / ROGER, Pierre
6, rue Paul Valéry
F-78423 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al
Sanofi
Département Brevets
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al
Sanofi-Synthélabo, Département Brevets, 174, avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00988916.314.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000FR03536
Priority number, dateFR1999001593517.12.1999         Original published format: FR 9915935
[2002/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0144207
Date:21.06.2001
Language:FR
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1242389
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242389
Date:21.04.2004
Language:FR
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.12.2001
ClassificationIPC:C07D249/14, A61K31/4196, A61P25/00
[2002/39]
CPC:
C07D249/14 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/4196 (KR); A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP); A61P15/00 (EP); A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP); A61P25/24 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesAL17.07.2002
LT17.07.2002
LV17.07.2002
MK17.07.2002
RO17.07.2002
SI17.07.2002
TitleGerman:VERZWEIGTE SUBSTITUIERTE AMINODERIVATE VOM 3-AMINO-1-PHENYL-1H[1,2,4]TRIAZOL, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND SIE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2002/39]
English:NOVEL BRANCHED SUBSTITUTED AMINO DERIVATIVES OF 3-AMINO-1-PHENYL-1H[1,2,4]TRIAZOL, METHODS FOR PRODUCING THEM AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM[2002/39]
French:NOUVEAUX DERIVES AMINO SUBSTITUES RAMIFIES DU 3-AMINO-1-PHENYL-1H[1,2,4]TRIAZOLE, PROCEDES POUR LEUR PREPARATION ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2002National basic fee paid 
17.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
30.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2004Fee for grant paid
23.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC31.12.2004
[2005/45]
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9639400  (NEUROCRINE BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9851686  (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,6-10* claim - *;
 [A]  - TRINKA, PETER ET AL, "Triazoles. XXXVI. The arylation of 5-amino-3-(methylthio)-1H-1,2,4- triazole with activated aryl chlorides", J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM. (1995), 32(4), 1359-71, XP002146823 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570320443
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.