Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240039

EP1240039 - REAR AXLE COMPRISING AN OPEN-END CROSS MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2006  [2006/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault s.a.s.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Renault s.a.s.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / RODRIGUEZ, Fernando
19, rue Poussin
F-75016 Paris / FR
02 / ROYER, Christine
219, Grande Rue
F-92380 Garches / FR
03 / KLEIN, Stéphane
4, allée des Sablières
F-78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Srour, Elie
RENAULT TECHNOCENTRE
Département Propriété Intellectuelle
Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36
1, avenue du Golf
78288 Guyancourt cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Srour, Elie
Renault, Technocentre, S.0267 - TCR AVA 0-56, 1, avenue du Golf
78288 Guyancourt / FR
Application number, filing date00988932.015.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000FR03554
Priority number, dateFR1999001618521.12.1999         Original published format: FR 9916185
[2002/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0145970
Date:28.06.2001
Language:FR
[2001/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240039
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240039
Date:23.11.2005
Language:FR
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60G21/05
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:HINTERACHSE MIT EINEM GESCHWEIFTEN QUERTRÄGER[2002/38]
English:REAR AXLE COMPRISING AN OPEN-END CROSS MEMBER[2002/38]
French:ESSIEU ARRIERE COMPORTANT UNE TRAVERSE ECHANCREE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase28.05.2002National basic fee paid 
28.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
25.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2005Fee for grant paid
26.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YA]DE19808172  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,7,10,11 * abstract * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 40 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 20 * [A] 2,3,5;
 [Y]JPH06239121  ;
 [A]EP0552537  (BENTELER IND INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure - *;
 [A]DE19720133  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,8,10 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4700796  (MORLOK ALBRECHT [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,8,10 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0430728  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,7,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5597175  (TUAN PHAM A [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 4,6 *;
 [A]FR2745240  (LORRAINE LAMINAGE [FR]) [A] 1,2,4 * figure - *;
 [A]JPS5893616
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941125), vol. 018, no. 620, Database accession no. (M - 1711), [Y] 1,7,10,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830824), vol. 007, no. 193, Database accession no. (M - 238), [A] 1,7,10 * abstract *