Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242404

EP1242404 - PHENOXYPROPANOLAMINES, PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
[2004/44]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
SANOFI-SYNTHELABO
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BOVY, Philippe, R.
13, rue du 4 Septembre
F-78750 Mareil Marly / FR
02 / CECCHI, Roberto
Piazza P. Gobetti 1D
I-26900 Lodi / IT
03 / VENIER, Olivier
6, rue de l'Amiral Courbet
F-94160 Saint Mandé / FR
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Varady, Peter , et al
Sanofi-Aventis 174 avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Varady, Peter , et al
Sanofi-Synthelabo, 174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00988936.115.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000FR03559
Priority number, dateFR1999001593317.12.1999         Original published format: FR 9915933
[2002/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0144227
Date:21.06.2001
Language:FR
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242404
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242404
Date:07.07.2004
Language:FR
[2004/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/04, A61K31/4545, A61K31/4523, A61P1/00, C07D401/14, C07D211/58
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesAL17.07.2002
LT17.07.2002
LV17.07.2002
MK17.07.2002
RO17.07.2002
SI17.07.2002
TitleGerman:PHENOXYPROPANOLAMIN-DERIVATE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG[2002/39]
English:PHENOXYPROPANOLAMINES, PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF[2002/39]
French:PHENOXYPROPANOLAMINES, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR APPLICATION EN THERAPEUTIQUE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2002National basic fee paid 
17.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
15.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2004Fee for grant paid
26.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.07.2004
CY07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
IT07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
TR07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
PT07.12.2004
LU15.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
CH31.12.2004
LI31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT07.07.2004
CY07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
IT07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
TR07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
LU15.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
CH31.12.2004
LI31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2007/09]AT07.07.2004
CY07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
TR07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
LU15.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
CH31.12.2004
LI31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/51]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
TR07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
BE31.12.2004
CH31.12.2004
LI31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/47]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
BE31.12.2004
CH31.12.2004
LI31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/14]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
BE31.12.2004
CH31.12.2004
LI31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/51]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
BE31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/45]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/24]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
Former [2005/23]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI07.07.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE07.10.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3524955  (SANDOZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * examples 42A,45A *;
 [D]BE902897  (SANDOZ SA);
 [A]EP0095454  (GEROT PHARMAZEUTIKA [AT]) [A] 1,5 * page 18 * * page 3, line 7 - line 8 *;
 [A]US5627196  (AUDIA JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * claims 1,5 *;
 [PX]WO9965895  (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [PX] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - M HORI ET AL, "A soluble polymer approach to the fishing out principle: synthesis and purification of beta-amino alcohols", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, (19980206), vol. 63, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 889 - 894-894, XP002110346 [AD] 1,5,6 * examples 19,26 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo971732l