Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240417

EP1240417 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING THE POWER OF A POWER PACK DRIVING A HELICOPTER ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Turbomeca
64510 Bordes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Turbomeca
64511 Bordes Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / NOUSSITOU, Christian, Pierre
Chemin de la Baysère
F-64360 Cuqueron / FR
02 / MARIN, Jean-Philippe Jacques
Appartement 31, 13, allée Lamartine
64000 Pau / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00988946.018.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000FR03571
Priority number, dateFR1999001639223.12.1999         Original published format: FR 9916392
[2002/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0148574
Date:05.07.2001
Language:FR
[2001/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240417
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240417
Date:08.03.2006
Language:FR
[2006/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:F02C9/28
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesGB,   IT,   NL [2004/22]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LEISTUNGSREGELUNG EINER HUBSCHRAUBER-ROTOR-ANTRIEBSEINHEIT[2002/38]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING THE POWER OF A POWER PACK DRIVING A HELICOPTER ROTOR[2002/38]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE LA PUISSANCE D'UN GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR D'ENTRAINEMENT DE ROTOR D'HELICOPTERE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2002National basic fee paid 
18.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
08.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2005Fee for grant paid
08.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT08.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]US4423593  (ZAGRANSKI RAYMOND D [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5775089  (SKARVAN CHARLES ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5046923  (PARSONS DOUGLAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure - *;
 [A]US4466526  (HOWLETT JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure - *;
 [A]US4648797  (MARTIN ANTHONY N [US]) [A] 1-11 * figure - *;
 [A]US5812428  (ZOU HEHONG [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *