blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1313486

EP1313486 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING CLARITHROMYCIN AND CLARITHROMYCIN INTERMEDIATE, ESSENTIALLY OXIME-FREE CLARITHROMYCIN, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2008
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Inventor(s)01 / AVRUTOV, Ilya
Beery Street 50
42842 Bat Hefer / IL
02 / LIFSHITZ, Igor
Shipnoza 9/11
Petach Tikva / IL
03 / LEWINER, Elizabeth
Shir Street 5
Tel Aviv Jaffa / IL
 [2003/22]
Representative(s)Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00989252.215.12.2000
[2003/22]
WO2000US33843
Priority number, dateUS20000185888P29.02.2000         Original published format: US 185888 P
US20000189120P14.03.2000         Original published format: US 189120 P
US20000213239P22.06.2000         Original published format: US 213239 P
[2003/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0164224
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1313486
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.09.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/70, C07H1/00, C07H17/08
[2003/22]
CPC:
C07H17/08 (EP,KR,US); C07F7/1892 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SI26.09.2002
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES CLARITHROMYCINS UND EINES CLARITHROMYCIN-ZWISCHENPRODUKT; CLARITHROMYCIN WESENTLICH FREI VON OXIME; UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DIE SIE ENTHALTEN[2003/22]
English:PROCESSES FOR PREPARING CLARITHROMYCIN AND CLARITHROMYCIN INTERMEDIATE, ESSENTIALLY OXIME-FREE CLARITHROMYCIN, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME[2003/22]
French:PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE LA CLARITHROMYCINE ET D'UN INTERMEDIAIRE DE LA CLARITHROMYCINE, NOTAMMENT LA CLARITHROMYCINE EXEMPTE D'OXIME, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CORRESPONDANTE[2003/22]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2002National basic fee paid 
26.09.2002Search fee paid 
26.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.09.2002Examination requested  [2003/22]
03.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/18]
06.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200607   M06   Not yet paid
31.12.200708   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US5837829  (KU YI-YIN [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.