Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240027

EP1240027 - IDENTIFICATION CARD PERSONALIZATION DEVICE WITH WEB BROWSER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fargo Electronics, Inc.
6533 Flying Cloud Drive
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / LENZ, Gary, A.
6536 Minstral Lane
Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US
02 / KLINEFELTER, Gary, M.
18763 Erin Bay
Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00989273.815.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US34050
Priority number, dateUS19990170987P15.12.1999         Original published format: US 170987 P
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0143979
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240027
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240027
Date:23.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/10
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM PERSONALIZIEREN EINER ID KARTE MIT WEB BROWSER[2002/38]
English:IDENTIFICATION CARD PERSONALIZATION DEVICE WITH WEB BROWSER[2002/38]
French:DISPOSITIF SERVANT A PERSONNALISER UNE CARTE D'IDENTIFICATION ET COMPORTANT UN EXPLORATEUR WEB[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2002National basic fee paid 
09.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/42]
01.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2007
13.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
13.12.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2008Fee for grant paid
06.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
CY23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
TR23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
GR24.10.2008
IE15.12.2008
LU15.12.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/37]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
CY23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
TR23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
IE15.12.2008
LU15.12.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/34]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
CY23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
IE15.12.2008
LU15.12.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/32]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
IE15.12.2008
LU15.12.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/09]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
IE15.12.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/47]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
IE15.12.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/34]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/19]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
PT23.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]WO8607480  (MEDIA NET LTD [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 7, line 24 - page 16, line 11; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0659588  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 31 - column 17, line 27; figures 1-14B *;
 [A]FR2667416  (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 5 - page 10, line 32; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0195104  (SKI DATA COMPUTERHANDELSGESELL [AT]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 33; figure 1 *
ExaminationUS5886334
by applicantUS5980011
 US6022429