Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239857

EP1239857 - DUAL-RELEASE COMPOSITIONS OF A CYCLOOXYGENASE-2- INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pharmacia Corporation
700 Chesterfield Parkway West
Chesterfield, MO 63017-1732 / US
[2006/15]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Pharmacia Corporation
Corporate Patent Department, P.O. Box 5110
Chicago, IL 60680-5110 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DESAI, Subhash
1011 Greenwood Avenue
Wilmette, IL 60091 / US
02 / NADKARNI, Sreekant
6957 Morgan Court
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
03 / WALD, Randy, J.
7714 Hillsmorre Lane
Portage, MI 49024 / US
04 / DE BRINCAT, Gary, A.
24 Drake Court
Plainwell, MI 49080 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2002/38]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date00989357.920.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US34754
Priority number, dateUS19990171738P22.12.1999         Original published format: US 171738 P
US20000181604P10.02.2000         Original published format: US 181604 P
US20000202270P05.05.2000         Original published format: US 202270 P
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0145706
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1239857
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239857
Date:19.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/42, A61K9/20, A61K31/415, A61K9/50
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesAL10.06.2002
LT10.06.2002
LV10.06.2002
MK10.06.2002
RO10.06.2002
SI10.06.2002
TitleGerman:ARZNEIZUBEREITUNGEN MIT ZWEI VERSCHIEDENEN FREISETZUNGSRATEN ENTHALTEND EINEN CYCLOOXYGENASE-2 HEMMER[2002/38]
English:DUAL-RELEASE COMPOSITIONS OF A CYCLOOXYGENASE-2- INHIBITOR[2002/38]
French:COMPOSITIONS A LIBERATION DOUBLE D'UN INHIBITEUR DE CYCLO-OXYGENASE-2[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2002National basic fee paid 
10.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
14.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2006Fee for grant paid
06.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT19.04.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]US5756529  (ISAKSON PETER C [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * claim - * * column 95, line 28 - column 97, line 22 *;
 [AD]WO9625405  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-27 * claim - * * page 150, line 24 - line 38 *;
 [AD]EP0863134  (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]) [AD] 1-27 * claim - * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 15 * * example - *;
 [AP]WO0032189  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [AP] 1-27 * claim - * * example - *;
 [AP]WO0053149  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [AP] 1-27 * claims 1,4,24,26,28-30,35,37,46,48,57,59,68,70,79,81,90 * * claims 92,101,103,112,114 * * page 58, line 22 - page 60, line 32 * * page 41, line 23 - page 45, line 18 *
Examination WO0178724