Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242439

EP1242439 - METHOD FOR PREPARING AND ISOLATING 9-DEOXO-9(Z)-HYDROXYIMINOERYTHROMYCIN A [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MERIAL
17, rue Bourgelat
69002 Lyon / FR
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BASSET, François
27, rue de la Doua
F-69100 Villeurbanne / US
02 / DURAND, Thierry
52, rue Hector Berlioz
69410 Champagne au Mont d Or / FR
03 / GUEVEL, Ronan
166, avenue des Frères Lumière
F-69008 Lyon / FR
04 / LEON, Patrick
.
décédé / FR
05 / LHERMITTE, Frédéric
25, rive d'Ozon
F-69360 Saint Symphorien D'Ozon / FR
06 / ODDON, Gilles
50D, rue Etienne Richerand
F-69003 Lyon / FR
07 / PAUZE, Denis
162, rue de l'Ozon
F-69360 Solaize / FR
 [2002/42]
Former [2002/39]01 / BASSET, François
27, rue de la Doua
F-69100 Villeurbanne / US
02 / DURAND, Thierry
13, chemin du Saquin
F-69130 Ecully / FR
03 / GUEVEL, Ronan
166, avenue des Frères Lumière
F-69008 Lyon / FR
04 / LEON, Patrick
9, chemin de la Vernique
F-69180 Tassin-la-Demi-Lune / FR
05 / LHERMITTE, Frédéric
25, rive d'Ozon
F-69360 Saint Symphorien D'Ozon / FR
06 / ODDON, Gilles
50D, rue Etienne Richerand
F-69003 Lyon / FR
07 / PAUZE, Denis
162, rue de l'Ozon
F-69360 Solaize / FR
Representative(s)Kling, Simone , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Kling, Simone , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date00990066.319.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000FR03595
Priority number, dateFR1999001610620.12.1999         Original published format: FR 9916106
[2002/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146211
Date:28.06.2001
Language:FR
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242439
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242439
Date:21.05.2003
Language:FR
[2003/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07H17/08
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND ISOLIERUNG VON 9-DEOXO-9(Z)-HYDROXYIMINOERYTHROMYCIN A[2002/39]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING AND ISOLATING 9-DEOXO-9(Z)-HYDROXYIMINOERYTHROMYCIN A[2002/39]
French:PROCEDE POUR PREPARER ET ISOLER LA 9-DEOXO-9(Z)-HYDROXYIMINOERYTHROMYCINE A[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2002National basic fee paid 
21.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
27.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2003Fee for grant paid
05.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9902541  (BIOCHEMIE SA [ES], et al) [X] 17,18 * page 6 - page 7 * * page 2 *;
 [A]WO9831699  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 17,18 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 22 *;
 [AD]EP0508699  (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [AD] 1-19 * page 7, line 12 - page 16 *;
 [AD]EP0503949  (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0503932  (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5808017  (CHANG SOU-JEN [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *