Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236121

EP1236121 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INTELLIGENT SCALABLE SWITCHING NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.11.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2006  [2006/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Garuda Networks Corporation
48499 Milmont Drive
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / GIDWANI, Sanjay, M.
18925 Mellon Drive
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date00990181.006.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US30582
Priority number, dateUS1999043755710.11.1999         Original published format: US 437557
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0135240
Date:17.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236121
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE FÜR EIN INTELLIGENTES, SKALIERBARES VERMITTLUNGSNETZ[2002/36]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INTELLIGENT SCALABLE SWITCHING NETWORK[2002/36]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR RESEAU INTELLIGENT COMMUTE EVOLUTIF[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2002National basic fee paid 
10.06.2002Search fee paid 
10.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
01.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/01]
26.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5905781  (MCHALE JOHN F [US], et al);
 [A]US4985891  (FUJIWARA RYUHEI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5430722  (JACOB JEAN-BAPTISTE [FR], et al);
 [A]US5805600  (VENTERS W STUART [US], et al);
 [A]US5926480  (DESCHAINE STEPHEN A [US], et al);
 [AP]US6052365  (BHAGALIA SHASHIKANT [GB], et al)