Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240692

EP1240692 - HIGH SPEED MAGNETIC MODULATOR VOLTAGE AND TEMPERATURE TIMING COMPENSATION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2007  [2007/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cymer, Inc.
17075 Thornmint Court
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
[2004/14]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Cymer, Inc.
16750 Via del Campo Court
San Diego, CA 92127-1712 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NESS, Richard, M.
9248 Citrus View Court
San Diego, CA 92126 / US
02 / PARTLO, William, N.
12634 Pedriza Drive
Poway, CA 92064 / US
03 / SANDSTROM, Richard, L.
410 Bridoon Terrace
Encinitas, CA 92024 / US
04 / JOHNS, David, M.
Apartment 60, 12852 Mapleview
Lakeside, CA 92040 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00990194.306.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US33200
Priority number, dateUS1999046542721.12.1999         Original published format: US 465427
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0147073
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240692
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/097, H01S3/225
[2005/46]
Former International [2002/38]H01S3/00, H01S3/04, H01S3/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2004/22]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSSPANNUNG- UND TEMPERATUR-ZEITKOMPENSATORSCHALTUNG FÜR MODULATOREN.[2002/38]
English:HIGH SPEED MAGNETIC MODULATOR VOLTAGE AND TEMPERATURE TIMING COMPENSATION CIRCUIT[2002/38]
French:CIRCUIT GRANDE VITESSE DE COMPENSATION DU MINUTAGE AGISSANT EN FONCTION DE LA TENSION ET DE LA TEMPERATURE D'UN MODULATEUR MAGNETIQUE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2002National basic fee paid 
17.06.2002Search fee paid 
17.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
14.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/30]
07.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9956356  (CYMER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * pages 6-12 *;
 [A]EP0481967  (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [A]  HILL J V ET AL, "Reliable, High Repetition Rate Thyratron Grid Driver Used With A Magnetic Modulator", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (19910616), pages 961 - 963, XP010299872 [A] 1-19 * page 961 - page 962; figure 2 *
International search[XP]US6016325  (NESS RICHARD M [US], et al);
 [A]US4549091  (FAHLEN THEODORE S [US], et al);
 [A]US5309462  (TAYLOR ROD S [CA], et al);
 [A]US5313481  (COOK EDWARD G [US], et al)