Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242112

EP1242112 - PARTICULATE DRUG-CONTAINING PRODUCTS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.06.2009
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.07.2009  [2009/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rxkinetix, Inc.
1172 Century Drive, Suite 260
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Rxkinetix, Inc.
1172 Century Drive, Suite 260
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ETTER, Jeffrey, B.
1318 Deer Trail Road
Boulder, CO 80302 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00990240.418.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US34436
Priority number, dateUS1999046973321.12.1999         Original published format: US 469733
US2000060478626.06.2000         Original published format: US 604786
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0145731
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242112
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/28, A61K9/12, A61K9/14, A61K9/16, C07K14/62, C07K14/64
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PARTIKEL-ENTHALTENDE MEDIKAMENTE UND METHODE ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2002/39]
English:PARTICULATE DRUG-CONTAINING PRODUCTS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2002/39]
French:PRODUITS CONTENANT DES PARTICULES DE SUBSTANCE MEDICAMENTEUSE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2002National basic fee paid 
16.07.2002Search fee paid 
16.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
21.02.2003Observations by third parties
15.04.2003Observations by third parties
07.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2008
04.07.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/28]
23.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/28]
Request for further processing for:14.06.2007Request for further processing filed
20.06.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.07.2007Decision despatched
18.01.2006Request for further processing filed
18.01.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.02.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
08.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9916419  (ALLIANCE PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-93 * page 54 - page 57; examples 10-13; table 7 *;
 [A]WO9829096  (INHALE THERAPEUTIC SYST [US]) [A] 1-93 * page 18, lines 13-23 *
International search[A]US4895719  (RADHAKRISHNAN RAMACHANDRAN [US], et al);
 [A]EP0542314  (UNIV PRINCETON [US]);
 [A]  - WINTERS M.A. ET AL., "Long-term and high-temperature storage of supercritically-processed microparticulate protein powders", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 1370 - 1378, XP002937784

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012112503590
otherWO9916419
 US5795594
 US5874064