Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238564

EP1238564 - DATA TRANSFER INTERFACE FOR A SWITCHING NETWORK AND A TEST METHOD FOR SAID NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / TROOST, Marcel-Abraham
Gabriele-Münter-Strasse 25
81477 München / DE
02 / LINDWURM, Franz
Strassbergerstrasse 103
80809 München / DE
03 / LAUBNER, Karsten
Am Waldrand 45
81377 München / DE
 [2002/37]
Application number, filing date00990524.112.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000DE04409
Priority number, dateDE199916114717.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19961147
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0145366
Date:21.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238564
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238564
Date:01.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04J3/12
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   SE [2004/20]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN KOPPELNETZWERK SOWIE DAZUGEHÖRIGES TESTVERFAHREN[2002/37]
English:DATA TRANSFER INTERFACE FOR A SWITCHING NETWORK AND A TEST METHOD FOR SAID NETWORK[2002/37]
French:INTERFACE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES POUR UN RESEAU DE COMMUTATION ET PROCEDE DE TEST CORRESPONDANT[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2002National basic fee paid 
15.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
21.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2005Fee for grant paid
10.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR01.03.2006
SE01.06.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2006/46]SE01.06.2006
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0895371  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * [A] 5-9,11-13;
 [A]GB1412136  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 94 - page 3, line 25 * * page 3, line 109 - page 5, line 4 *