Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240220

EP1240220 - POLYVINYL ALCOHOL STABILISED POLYMERISATE FOR IMPROVING THE OPTIMAL BRIGHTENING OF COATING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LEYRER, Reinhold, J.
Wasgauring 4
67125 Dannstadt / DE
02 / HANCIOGULLARI, Harutyun
Parkstrasse 41
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
 [2002/38]
Application number, filing date00990657.906.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000EP12273
Priority number, dateDE199916086317.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19960863
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0144329
Date:21.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240220
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08F261/04, C08L51/00, C09D151/00, C08K5/00, C09D133/06, C09D157/00
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:MIT POLYVINYLALKOHOL STABILISIERTE POLYMERISATE ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG DER OPTIMALEN AUFHELLUNG VON BESCHICHTUNGSMASSEN[2002/38]
English:POLYVINYL ALCOHOL STABILISED POLYMERISATE FOR IMPROVING THE OPTIMAL BRIGHTENING OF COATING MATERIALS[2002/38]
French:POLYMERISATS STABILISES AVEC DE L'ALCOOL POLYVINYLIQUE POUR LE RENFORCEMENT DE L'ECLAIRCISSEMENT OPTIMAL DE MATIERES DE RECOUVREMENT[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2002National basic fee paid 
16.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
15.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US5208282  (REHMER GERD [DE], et al) [X] 1-22 * Ansprüche 1-4 ; Spalte 9, Zeile 39-41 ; Spalte 12, Zeile 27-37 ; Spalte 13, Zeile 1-35 *; column 3, line 9 - column 9, line 8 *;
 [X]GB822709  (IND COLOURS LTD) [X] 1-3,6,9-11,13,15,16,18-21 * Ansprüche 1-10 ; Verfahren E ; Seite 1, Zeile 40 - Seite 2, Zeile 17 ; Beispiele 1-4 *; page 1, lines 8-36 *;
 [X]EP0044995  (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,10,12-21 * Ansprüche 1-10 ; Beispiele 1-9 *; page 1, lines 1-15 *;
 [Y]EP0960920  (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-22 * Ansprüche 1-7 *; page 4, lines 21-27 *;
 [Y]US5231145  (BRUECKMANN RALF [DE], et al) [Y] 1-22 * Ansprüche 1-4 ; Spalte 4, Zeile 57 ; Beispiele ; Spalte 2, Zeile 50-61 *; column 1, lines 21-29 *;
 [A]GB915237  (BASF AG) [A] 1-22 * Ansprüche 1-5 ; Seite 1, Zeile 9-20 ; Seite 1, Zeile 59-63 *; page 2, lines 24-30 *;
 [A]EP0960889  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * Beispiele *;; claims 1-6 *