Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238282

EP1238282 - METHODS OF DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT BY BINDING P75/AIRM1 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universita Degli Studi di Genova, Dipartimento di Medicina Sperimentale
Via Leon Battista Alberti
16132 Genova / IT
[2009/13]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Universita Degli Studi di Genova, Dipartimento di Medicina Sperimentale
Via Leon Battista Alberti
16132 Genova / IT
Inventor(s)01 / BIASSONI, Roberto, Universita Degli Studi Di Genova
Dipt. Med. Sperimentale, Via Leon Battista Alberti
I-16132 Genova / IT
02 / MORETTA, Alessandro, Universita Degli Studi Di Genova
Dipt. Med. Sperimentale, Via Leon Battista Alberti
I-16132 Genova / IT
03 / MORETTA, Lorenzo, Universita Degli Studi Di Genova
Dipt. Med. Sperimentale, Via Leon Battista Alberti
I-16132 Genova / IT
04 / MINGARI, Maria C., Universita Degli Studi Di Genova
Dipt. Med. Sperimentale, Via Leon Battista Alberti
I-16132 Genova / IT
 [2009/13]
Former [2002/37]01 / BIASSONI, Roberto, Universita Degli Studi Genova
Dipt. Med. Sperimentale, Via Leon Battista Alberti
I-16132 Genova / IT
02 / MORETTA, Alessandro, Universita Degli Studi Genova
Dipt. Med. Sperimentale, Via Leon Battista Alberti
I-16132 Genova / IT
03 / MORETTA, Lorenzo, Universita Degli Studi Di Genova
Dipt. Med. Sperimentale, Via Leon Battista Alberti
I-16132 Genova / IT
04 / MINGARI, Maria C., Universita Degli Studi Genova
Dipt. Med. Sperimentale, Via Leon Battista Alberti
I-16132 Genova / IT
Representative(s)Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00990705.611.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000EP12509
Priority number, dateIT1999FI0025416.12.1999         Original published format: IT FI990254
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0144808
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238282
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238282
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/574, G01N33/566, C07K16/28, A61K39/395
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG DURCH BINDUNG VON P75/AIRM1[2002/37]
English:METHODS OF DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT BY BINDING P75/AIRM1[2002/37]
French:METHODES DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT PAR LIAISON DE P75/AIRM1[2002/37]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase04.07.2002National basic fee paid 
04.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
23.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2009Fee for grant paid
09.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
12.05.2008Request for further processing filed
12.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
23.05.2007Request for further processing filed
23.05.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.06.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200203   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2003
31.12.200304   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2004
31.12.200708   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2008
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CY25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
IT25.03.2009
TR25.03.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT31.08.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/14]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
IT25.03.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/47]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2009/49]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
ES06.07.2009
Former [2009/43]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
Former [2009/40]AT25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
Former [2009/37]FI25.03.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0867721  (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [A] 1,6,7,14,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8805783  (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]) [A] 1,6,7,14,16 * abstract *;
 [PX]  - VITALE, CHIARA ET AL, "Engagement of p75 / AIRM1 or CD33 inhibits the proliferation of normal or leukemic myeloid cells", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A. (1999), 96(26), 15091-15096, (19991221), XP002171141 [PX] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.26.15091
 [X]  - FALCO, MICHELA ET AL, "Identification and molecular cloning of p75 / AIRM1, A novel member of the sialoadhesin family that functions as an inhibitory receptor in human natural killer cells", J. EXP. MED. (1999), 190(6), 793-801, (19990920), XP002926725 [X] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.190.6.793
ExaminationUS5730982
 US5714350