Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242655

EP1242655 - ASBESTOS-FREE DIAPHRAGM, COMPRISING NON-FIBROUS MINERAL PARTICLES, COMBINATION COMPRISING SAME, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.02.2005  [2005/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chloralp
Rue R Lavoisier BP 21
38800 Le Pont De Claix / FR
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / LE HELLOCO, Jean-Guy
10, rue De Villiers
F-92300 Levallois-Perret / FR
02 / PERINEAU, Jean-Maurice
18, allée du Sabot
F-38640 Claix / FR
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Schouller, Jean-Philippe , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
62, Rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Schouller, Jean-Philippe , et al
Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62 rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Application number, filing date00990842.728.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000FR03732
Priority number, dateFR1999001675230.12.1999         Original published format: FR 9916752
[2002/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0149902
Date:12.07.2001
Language:FR
[2001/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242655
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:C25B13/04
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2004/22]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:NICHT-FASERIGE MINERALTEILCHEN ENTHALTENDES DIAFRAGMA, VERBINDUNG EINES SOLCHEN DIAFRAGMAS UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG[2002/39]
English:ASBESTOS-FREE DIAPHRAGM, COMPRISING NON-FIBROUS MINERAL PARTICLES, COMBINATION COMPRISING SAME, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND USE THEREOF[2002/39]
French:DIAPHRAGME EXEMPT D'AMIANTE, COMPRENANT DES PARTICULES MINERALES NON FIBREUSES, ASSOCIATION LE COMPRENANT, SON OBTENTION ET SON UTILISATION[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2002National basic fee paid 
12.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/07]
20.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9316217  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,15 * page 6; example 1 * * page 14 - page 15; claims 1-15 *;
 [Y]US4720334  (DUBOIS DONALD W [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,15 * column 3, line 16 - line 48 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 60 *;
 [A]US5683749  (DUBOIS DONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 45 * * column 9; example 1 * * column 17 - column 20; claims 1-23 *;
 [DA]EP0412917  (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [DA] 1,19 * page 11 - page 12; claims 1-20 *