Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243084

EP1243084 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPOSING A BI-DIRECTIONAL S 0? DATA STREAM FOR TRANSMISSION VIA A LOW-VOLTAGE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.2005
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / IDE, Hans-Dieter
Aplerbecker Schulstrasse 24
44287 Dortmund / DE
02 / NEUHAUS, Ralf
Friedrich-Wilhelm-Weber-Strasse 22 M
44534 Lünen / DE
03 / STOLLE, Jörg
Lierberg 40
45478 Mülheim / DE
 [2002/43]
Former [2002/39]01 / IDE, Hans-Dieter
Aplerbecker Schulstrasse 24
44287 Dortmund / DE
02 / NEUHAUS, Ralf
Friedrich-Wilhelm-Weber-Strasse 22 M
44534 Lünen / DE
03 / STOLLE, Jörg
Glatzerstrasse 69 b
58511 Lüdenscheid / DE
Application number, filing date00991103.319.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000DE04546
Priority number, dateDE199916380030.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19963800
[2002/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0150628
Date:12.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243084
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1243084
Date:10.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04B3/54, H04Q11/04
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:UMSETZUNG EINES BIDIREKTIONALEN SO-DATENSTROMS FUR EINE UBERMITTLUNG UBER EIN NIEDERSPANNUNGSSTROMNETZ[2002/39]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPOSING A BI-DIRECTIONAL S 0? DATA STREAM FOR TRANSMISSION VIA A LOW-VOLTAGE NETWORK[2002/39]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CONVERTIR UN FLUX DE DONNEES S 0? AFIN DE LE TRANSMETTRE SUR UN RESEAU BASSE TENSION[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2002National basic fee paid 
11.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
23.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2003Fee for grant paid
17.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
TR10.03.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
PT10.08.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/09]CY10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
TR10.03.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2006/51]FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
TR10.03.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2005/18]FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2005/05]FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2005/03]FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI10.03.2004
SE10.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]  - HENSEN C ET AL, "ISDN-So-Bus Extension by Power-Line Using CDMA Technique", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON POWER-LINE COMMUNICATIONS AND ITS APPLICATIONS (ISPLC'99), LANCASTER, UK, (19990330), XP001009460 [A] 1-14 * Seite 121, Abschnitt "Introduction" * * Seite 124, Abschnitt "System Structure" - Seite 125 *
 [A]  - FÖHST C ET AL, "Unter Strom -Die Power-Line-Technologie vor dem kommerziellen Einsatz", NET - ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR KOMMUNIKATIONSMANAGEMENT, (1998), vol. 52, no. 7, ISSN 0947-4765, pages 48 - 49, XP000777785 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0913955