Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242205

EP1242205 - PRE-TREATMENT OF A THIXOTROPIC METAL BOLT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcan Technology & Management AG
Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / PLATA, Miroslaw
Chemin Neuf 28
CH-1963 Vétroz / CH
02 / BAGNOUD, Christophe
Route de Riondaz 38
CH-3968 Veyras / CH
03 / ARNOLD, Grégoire
La Rotze
CH-3972 Miège / CH
04 / BOLLIGER, Martin
Route de Miège
CH-3973 Venthône / CH
 [2002/39]
Application number, filing date00991167.812.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000EP12554
Priority number, dateEP1999081119622.12.1999         Original published format: EP 99811196
[2002/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0145880
Date:28.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242205
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242205
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B22D17/00, F27D3/12, F27B9/32
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [2003/26]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORBEHANDLUNG EINES THIXOTROPEN METALLBOLZENS[2002/39]
English:PRE-TREATMENT OF A THIXOTROPIC METAL BOLT[2002/39]
French:PRETRAITEMENT D'UNE BILLETTE THIXOTROPIQUE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2002National basic fee paid 
22.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
04.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2003Fee for grant paid
14.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.12.2003
LU12.12.2003
ES13.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
FR31.12.2003
[2008/42]
Former [2005/27]AT12.12.2003
LU12.12.2003
ES13.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
Former [2005/23]AT12.12.2003
LU12.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
Former [2005/22]AT12.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
Former [2005/01]BE31.12.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US5878804  (WILLIAMS SAMUEL B [US], et al) [A] 1,8,12 * column 3, line 52 - line 63; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0841406  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 8, line 46 - line 51; figures 3,12,13 * * page 9, line 18 - line 25 * * page 10, line 10 - line 35 *;
 [A]JPH08300126  ;
 [DA]EP0645206  (WEBER SRL [IT]) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0713736  (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, [A] 1,12 * abstract *