Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1165294

EP1165294 - HAND-HELD ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE FOR PERSONAL CARE OR FOR USE AS A TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DAMSTRA, Ate, K.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date00991281.727.12.2000
[2002/01]
WO2000EP13366
Priority number, dateEP2000020024724.01.2000         Original published format: EP 00200247
[2002/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154869
Date:02.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1165294
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1165294
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B26B19/38, B25F5/00
[2002/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/23]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:TRAGBARES ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT FÜR DIE KÖRPERPFLEGE ODER ZUM VERWENDEN ALS WERKZEUG[2002/01]
English:HAND-HELD ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE FOR PERSONAL CARE OR FOR USE AS A TOOL[2002/01]
French:APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE A MAIN DESTINE AUX SOINS PERSONNELS OU UTILISABLE COMME OUTIL[2002/01]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2001National basic fee paid 
04.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
27.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2003Fee for grant paid
06.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT04.06.2003
ES15.09.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2004/03]ES15.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2328630  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 3; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5983502  (GEERTSMA GEERT [NL], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5681993  (HEITMAN LYNN BYRON [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 34 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 18; figures 1,6 *