EP1238246 - APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR MEASURING A PARAMETER WITHIN A CLOSED ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/37] | SYSTEM FOR MEASURING A PARAMETER WITHIN A CLOSED ENVIRONMENT | ||
[2003/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J & M Holding B.V. P.O. Box 607 3235 ZJ Rockanje / NL | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOSTHOF, Johannes, Hendrik, Jacob Boomweg 28 NL-3235 NH Rockanje / NL | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/37] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00991329.4 | 18.12.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000NL00926 | Priority number, date | NL19991013884 | 17.12.1999 Original published format: NL 1013884 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0144758 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238246 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238246 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/48 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
G01D5/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT UND SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG EINES PARAMETERS IN EINEM GESCHLOSSENEN RAUM | [2003/25] | English: | APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR MEASURING A PARAMETER WITHIN A CLOSED ENVIRONMENT | [2003/25] | French: | APPAREIL ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE MESURER UN PARAMETRE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT CLOS | [2003/25] |
Former [2002/37] | SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG EINES PARAMETERS IN EINEM GESCHLOSSENEN RAUM | ||
Former [2002/37] | SYSTEM FOR MEASURING A PARAMETER WITHIN A CLOSED ENVIRONMENT | ||
Former [2002/37] | SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE MESURER UN PARAMETRE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT CLOS | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2004 | BE | 03.03.2004 | CH | 03.03.2004 | CY | 03.03.2004 | FI | 03.03.2004 | LI | 03.03.2004 | TR | 03.03.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | GR | 03.06.2004 | SE | 03.06.2004 | ES | 14.06.2004 | PT | 03.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
CY | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
TR | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
TR | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
SE | 03.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0563713 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [Y] 1-9* column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 32 *; | [Y]US5298894 (CERNY DAVID L [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * |