Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1275191

EP1275191 - AXIAL GAP MOTOR-GENERATOR FOR HIGH SPEED OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Optimal Energy Systems, Inc.
2560 West 237th Street
Torrance, CA 90505 / US
[2009/08]
Former [2008/52]For all designated states
Optimal Energy Systems, Inc.
2560 West 237th Street
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
Swett, Dwight W.
5342 West 123rd Street
Hawthorne, CA 90250 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Swett, Dwight. W.
5342 west 123rd Street
Hawthorne CA 90250 / US
 [2008/52]
Former [2003/03]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Sigh, Erik
Plougmann & Vingtoft a/s
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DK
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Sigh, Erik
Plougmann & Vingtoft a/s Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831
DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK
Former [2003/03]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date00991381.529.09.2000
[2003/03]
WO2000US26869
Priority number, dateUS19990156746P30.09.1999         Original published format: US 156746 P
US2000056669308.05.2000         Original published format: US 566693
[2003/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0128069
Date:19.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1275191
Date:15.01.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001
[2003/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1275191
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.12.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/27, H02K1/28, H02K21/24
[2005/03]
Former International [2003/03]H02K1/22, H02K21/12, H02K37/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/03]
TitleGerman:MOTOR-GENERATOR MIT AXIALSPALT FÜR HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSBETRIEB[2008/08]
English:AXIAL GAP MOTOR-GENERATOR FOR HIGH SPEED OPERATION[2003/03]
French:MOTEUR-GENERATEUR A ENTREFER AXIAL POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT A GRANDE VITESSE[2003/03]
Former [2003/03]MOTOR-GENERATOR MIT AXIALLÜCKE FÜR SCHNELLEN BETRIEB
Entry into regional phase01.10.2002National basic fee paid 
01.10.2002Search fee paid 
01.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
27.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
30.10.2008Fee for grant paid
30.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
30.10.2008Request for further processing filed
30.10.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
27.10.2005Request for further processing filed
27.10.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.11.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.10.2002AT   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002BE   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002CH   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002CY   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002DK   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002ES   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002FI   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002GB   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002GR   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002IE   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002LU   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002MC   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002NL   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002PT   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
01.10.2002SE   M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.10.2002M01   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200203   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2002
30.09.200405   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2005
30.09.200708   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2008
30.09.200809   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2008
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
GB29.09.2009
IE29.09.2009
LU29.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/21]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
GB29.09.2009
IE29.09.2009
LU29.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/14]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
GB29.09.2009
IE29.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/01]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
GB29.09.2009
IE29.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/46]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
IE29.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/35]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
IE29.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/20]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2009/49]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/43]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/37]FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/33]ES29.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US4864175  (ROSSI LOTHAR [DE]) [A] 1-33,36 * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 13; figure 2 *;
 [A]JPS62213540  ;
 [A]DE2532049  (CEM COMP ELECTRO MEC) [A] 1-33,36 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 4; figure 1 *;
 [PA]GB2338117  (TURBO GENSET COMPANY LTD [GB]) [PA] 2,15-24 * page 6 - page 10; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880305), vol. 0120, no. 72, Database accession no. (E - 588), [A] 1-33,36 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5831365  (KEIM THOMAS A [US], et al);
 [YE]US6181048  (SMITH STEPHEN H [US], et al);
 [Y]US5168187  (BAER JOHN S [US], et al)