Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1247021

EP1247021 - PLAIN BEARING AND WIND ENERGY UNIT WITH SAID BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2016Opposition rejectedpublished on 13.04.2016  [2016/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wobben, Aloys
Argestraße 19
26607 Aurich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/41]For all designated states
Wobben, Aloys
Argestrasse 19
26607 Aurich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/41]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2002/41]Göken, Klaus G.
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date00991627.122.12.2000
[2002/41]
WO2000EP13166
Priority number, dateDE199916297824.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19962978
[2002/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0148376
Date:05.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1247021
Date:09.10.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1247021
Date:28.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:F03D1/00
[2002/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GLEITLAGER UND WINDENERGIEANLAGE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN GLEITLAGER[2002/41]
English:PLAIN BEARING AND WIND ENERGY UNIT WITH SAID BEARING[2002/41]
French:PALIER A GLISSEMENT ET EOLIENNE EQUIPEE DE CE DERNIER[2002/41]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2002National basic fee paid 
16.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
25.09.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2004Fee for grant paid
24.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.01.2005  03.02.2005  ADMISSIBLE
IDASWIND GmbH & Co. KG
Schwielowseestr.91
14548 Schwielowsee / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel
Sendlinger Strasse 42A
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/41]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2005  03.02.2005  ADMISSIBLE
IDASWIND GmbH & Co. KG
Schwielowseestr.91
14548 Schwielowsee / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel
Patentanwälte Sckellstrasse 3
81667 München / DE
Former [2008/16]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2005  03.02.2005  ADMISSIBLE
IDASWIND GmbH & Co. KG
Oranienstr. 56
10969 Berlin / DE
Former [2005/12]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2005  03.02.2005  ADMISSIBLE
IDASWIND GmbH & Co. KG
Oranienstr. 56
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Seranski, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Dr.
Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
04.03.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.07.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.07.2005Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2006Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
17.09.2007Date of oral proceedings
06.11.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: opposition inadmissible 01
06.11.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
29.12.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.12.2011Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
27.01.2016Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/15]
Appeal following opposition30.01.2012Appeal received No.  T0197/12
27.04.2012Statement of grounds filed
27.01.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
07.01.2008Appeal received No.  T0025/08
17.03.2008Statement of grounds filed
20.04.2010Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipTR28.04.2004
MC31.12.2004
[2006/51]
Former [2005/45]MC31.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE19629168  (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-14 * column 3, line 14 - line 19 * * column 3, line 32 - line 57 * * figures 6,7 * * claim 9 * [Y] 9;
 [Y]GB2177374  (KENZ KRAANTECHNIEK BV) [Y] 9 * page 2, line 10 - line 41 *;
 [XY]EP0821161  (AERODYN ENERGIESYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-12 * column 3, line 27 - line 35 * * figure 2 * * claims 7,8 * [Y] 3-6;
 [Y]DE29806010U  (MITSCH FRANZ [DE]) [Y] 3-6 * page 5, line 6 - line 19 * * page 6, line 1 - line 5 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5937734  (STIEFEL HANS-PETER [DE], et al) [A] 6 * column 3, line 17 - line 30 *;
 [X]DE4432800  (HOCHTIEF AG HOCH TIEFBAUTEN [DE]) [X] 1,3,10-13 * column 2, line 29 - line 55 *;
 [X]RU2054578  (AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO ZAKRY [RU]) [X] 1,2,10-13 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE19645581  (DRE CON GROSWAELZLAGER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * column 2, line 21 - line 22 *;
 [DA]DE19510182  (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 1 * * figure 3 *
by applicantDE4104137
 DE19629168
 DE19814629