Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1247021 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1247021



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 914
07.03.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.01.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.01.2016 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
27.01.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
27.01.2016 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 2
27.01.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.01.2016 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
14.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
13.01.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
13.01.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
08.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.12.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
10.12.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.09.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
25.09.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
23.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.07.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.05.2013 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.02.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
19.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.11.2012 Claims Appeal 2
19.11.2012 Claims Appeal 2
19.11.2012 Claims Appeal 2
19.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.11.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
18.09.2012 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
13.09.2012 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
18.07.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.07.2012 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
09.05.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.04.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.04.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
27.04.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.04.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
14.02.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
02.02.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
31.01.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.01.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 44
29.12.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
29.12.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 46
29.12.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 15
29.12.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
29.12.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
29.12.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.10.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
23.09.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.09.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
22.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
10.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
10.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
09.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
09.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
09.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
09.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
09.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.09.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
09.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
09.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.09.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
08.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
08.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
08.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 9
31.08.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2011 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
14.07.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 6
14.07.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.07.2011 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
14.07.2011 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
14.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2011 General enquiry Opposition 1
14.02.2011 Notice on debiting of fees Opposition 1
08.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.04.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 21
02.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
30.10.2009 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.10.2009 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 3
02.10.2009 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
21.09.2009 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
17.09.2009 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 8
08.09.2009 Request for a change of address - opponent Appeal 1
29.08.2009 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 3
12.08.2009 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
31.07.2009 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 3
27.07.2009 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 9
13.10.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
07.08.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
04.08.2008 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
31.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
28.03.2008 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.03.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.03.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.03.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.03.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.03.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.03.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.03.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
17.03.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
11.03.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2008 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
31.01.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
21.01.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
09.01.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.01.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.01.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
09.11.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.11.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
06.11.2007 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
06.11.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.10.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.07.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.04.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.04.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.02.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.02.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.02.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
20.02.2007 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.02.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.02.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.01.2006 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
28.11.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.07.2005 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
08.07.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.07.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
04.03.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.03.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.01.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 8
25.01.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
25.01.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.01.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.03.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.02.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.02.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.02.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.11.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.11.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.11.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
17.10.2003 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.09.2003 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
25.09.2003 Description Search / examination 4
09.09.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.08.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.08.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
21.06.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.05.2002 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 5
14.03.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
14.03.2002 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
15.01.2002 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
15.01.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
23.11.2001 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.11.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.11.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.11.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.11.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.11.2001 Despatch of copy of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.11.2001 Result of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.11.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.11.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.11.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.11.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
02.11.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.10.2001 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.10.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
18.10.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
06.08.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.08.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.07.2001 Priority document Search / examination 10
18.07.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.07.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.07.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 15
28.02.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.02.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 2
28.02.2001 Description International Searching Authority 6
28.02.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 5