Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259844

EP1259844 - Production line for mounting and alignment of an optical component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/48]OPTICAL FIBER ALIGNMENT PROCESS USING SUPPORT DEVICE WITH PLASTIC DEFORMATION
[2005/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Axsun Technologies, Inc.
1 Fortune Drive
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / FLANDERS, Dale, C.
15 Preston Road
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
02 / WHITNEY, Peter, S.
39 Shade Street
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Ganahl, Bernhard , et al
Huber & Schüssler
Patentanwälte
Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Ganahl, Bernhard , et al
Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
Former [2002/48]Ganahl, Bernhard
Reinhardt Söllner Ganahl, Hausen 5b
85551 Kirchheim b. München / DE
Application number, filing date00991857.414.11.2000
[2002/48]
WO2000US31180
Priority number, dateUS19990165431P15.11.1999         Original published format: US 165431 P
US20000186925P03.03.2000         Original published format: US 186925 P
US2000064582725.08.2000         Original published format: US 645827
US2000064834925.08.2000         Original published format: US 648349
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0137020
Date:25.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1259844
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259844
Date:02.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/42
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Produktionslinie zur Montage und Ausrichtung eines optischen Elementes[2005/22]
English:Production line for mounting and alignment of an optical component[2005/22]
French:Chaîne de production pour l'assemblage et l'alignement d'un composant optique[2005/22]
Former [2002/48]GLASFASERAUSRICHTUNG MIT PLASTISCH VERFORMBARER HALTEEINRICHTUNG
Former [2002/48]OPTICAL FIBER ALIGNMENT PROCESS USING SUPPORT DEVICE WITH PLASTIC DEFORMATION
Former [2002/48]PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION DE COMPOSANTS OPTIQUES
Entry into regional phase22.05.2002National basic fee paid 
22.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
24.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2005Fee for grant paid
27.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.11.2005
[2007/35]
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0647091  (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 14-18,21 * the whole document *;
 [YA]GB2296100  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [Y] 14-18,21 * abstract * * page 5, line 23 - line 34 * * page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 30 * [A] 6;
 [A]WO9106022  (BT & D TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 7, line 5 - line 32 * * page 5, lines 1-7 *;
 [A]FR2690996  (THOMSON HYBRIDES [FR]) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 27 *;
 [A]US5870518  (HAAKE JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 14 *;
 [A]US5351330  (JONGEWAARD ERIK N [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 26 - line 31 *;
 [A]US4528747  (HOFFMAN BRIAN D [US], et al) [A] 14-21 * abstract *;
 [A]  - KRAVITZ S H ET AL, "A PASSIVE MICROMACHINED DEVICE FOR ALIGNMENT OF ARRAYS OF SINGLE- MODE FIBERS FOR MANUFACTURABLE PHOTONIC PACKAGING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING. (LEOS),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19941031), vol. MEETING 7, ISBN 0-7803-1471-9, pages 226 - 227, XP000510762 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KNIGHT J D ET AL, "A TWO-AXIS MICROPOSITIONER FOR OPTICAL FIBER ALIGNMENT", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, HEWLETT-PACKARD CO. PALO ALTO, US, (19931201), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 80 - 84, XP000422721 [A] 14 * the whole document *
ExaminationGB2229856
    - COOPER K.A. ET AL, "FLIP CHIP EQUIPMENT FOR HIGH END ELECTRO-OPTICAL MODULES", 1998 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 48TH. ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, ECTC 1998. SEATTLE, (19980525), pages 176 - 180, XP000803614
    - QING TAN; LEE Y.C., "Soldering technology for optoelectronic packaging", ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (19960528), pages 26 - 36, XP010167325

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECTC.1996.517371