EP1236256 - CABLE GROMMET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ehmann, Bruno Nelkenstrasse 12 73563 Mögglingen / DE | For all designated states Bethke, Detlev Lange Strasse 44 74405 Gaildorf / DE | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00992064.6 | 27.11.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000EP11809 | Priority number, date | DE1999159185 | 08.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19959185 | [2002/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0142046 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1236256 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236256 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/08, H02G3/22 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
H02G3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KABELDURCHFÜHRUNG | [2002/36] | English: | CABLE GROMMET | [2002/36] | French: | PASSE-CABLE | [2002/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 02.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.07.2003 | IE | 09.07.2003 | NL | 09.07.2003 | TR | 09.07.2003 | DK | 09.10.2003 | GR | 09.10.2003 | SE | 09.10.2003 | CY | 27.11.2003 | LU | 27.11.2003 | BE | 30.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | PT | 09.12.2003 | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 09.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3742119 (NEWMAN A) [A] 1,8,10-12* figure - *; | [X]DE4020180 (RITTAL) [X] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9906747 (MURRPLASTIK SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document * | Examination | DE3619183 |