Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240428

EP1240428 - COMPRESSOR VALVE WITH INTEGRATED SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coltec Industries Inc.
4 Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217 / US
For all designated states
Windrock Incorporated
431 Park Village Drive
Knoxville, TN 37923 / US
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHROEDER, David, M.
53 Chatham Place
Newtown, PA 18940 / US
02 / FOLLMAR, Steve
14403 Sycamore Lake Road
Houston, TX 77062 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Hammler, Martin Franz , et al
Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Hammler, Martin Franz , et al
Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Application number, filing date00992686.608.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US42713
Priority number, dateUS19990170176P10.12.1999         Original published format: US 170176 P
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0142650
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240428
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:F04B1/00
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERDICHTERVENTIL MIT INTEGRIERTEM SENSOR[2002/38]
English:COMPRESSOR VALVE WITH INTEGRATED SENSOR[2002/38]
French:SOUPAPE DESTINEE A CAPTER AU MOINS UNE CONDITION DANS UN COMPRESSEUR[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2002National basic fee paid 
09.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
15.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/43]
07.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5567121  (PETERSON WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1-4,10,12,13,15,20 * the whole document * * column 3, line 21 - line 49; figure 1 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 8 *;
 [A]US5846056  (DHINDSA JASBIR S [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 5, line 32 - line 44; figure 2 *