Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240402

EP1240402 - TECHNIQUE FOR SIGNAL DETECTION USING ADAPTIVE FILTERING IN MUD PULSE TELEMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2011
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smith International, Inc.
16740 Hardy Street
Houston, TX 77032 / US
[2009/15]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
W-H Energy Services, Inc.
13070 Richmond Avenue, Suite 990
Houston, TX 77042 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ABDALLAH, Ali, H.
17123 Crown Meadow Court
Houston, TX 77095 / US
02 / BEATTIE, Mark, S.
22814 Elm Wing Lane
Katy, TX 77450 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Lamb, Richard Andrew , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Lamb, Richard Andrew , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough
Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB
Former [2008/46]Lamb, Richard Andrew , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough
Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB
Former [2008/21]Foxon, Rachel Siobhan , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff
CF10 2HH / GB
Former [2002/38]Cawdell, Karen Teresa , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Three Trinity Court 21-27 Newport Road
Cardiff, CF24 0AA / GB
Application number, filing date00992691.608.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US42725
Priority number, dateUS1999046998922.12.1999         Original published format: US 469989
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0146548
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240402
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240402
Date:14.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.08.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:E21B47/18, G01V11/00
[2003/28]
Former International [2002/46]G01V1/40
Former International [2002/38]E21B1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG ZUR SIGNALERKENNUNG MIT ADAPTIVER FILTERTECHNIK IN DER DRUCKPULSTELEMETRIE[2002/38]
English:TECHNIQUE FOR SIGNAL DETECTION USING ADAPTIVE FILTERING IN MUD PULSE TELEMETRY[2002/38]
French:TECHNIQUE DE DETECTION DE SIGNAL AU MOYEN DU FILTRAGE ADAPTATIF DANS LA TELEMETRIE PAR IMPULSIONS DANS LA BOUE[2010/09]
Former [2002/38]TECHNIQUE DE DETECTION DE SIGNAL AU MOYEN DE FILTRATION ADAPTEE DANS UNE UNIT DE T L MESURE PAR IMPULSIONS DANS LA BOUE
Entry into regional phase07.06.2002National basic fee paid 
07.06.2002Search fee paid 
07.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
17.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2010Fee for grant paid
01.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25]
Request for further processing for:10.01.2006Request for further processing filed
12.01.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.01.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
TR14.07.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
IE08.12.2010
LU08.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
FR03.01.2011
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
IE08.12.2010
LU08.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
FR03.01.2011
Former [2011/47]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
IE08.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
FR03.01.2011
Former [2011/36]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/31]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/19]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
GR15.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/16]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
GR15.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/15]AT14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
GR15.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/13]AT14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/10]AT14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/08]AT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2147722  (DRESSER IND) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 53 - line 56 * * page 4, line 16 - page 7, line 65 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]US2787759  (ARPS JAN J) [Y] 3 * column 8, line 1 - line 3; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [XAY]US4590593  (RODNEY PAUL F [US]) [X] 14 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 11 - line 20 * * column 6, line 27 - line 42 * [A] 8 [Y] 5;
 [XY]US5969638  (CHIN WILSON C [US]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 3, line 62 - line 67 * * column 4, line 25 - line 37 * * column 4, line 46 - line 54 * * column 6, line 23 - line 65 * [Y] 5;
 [A]US4733232  (GROSSO DONALD S [US]) [A] 5,8,14-17 * column 5, line 42 - line 46 * * abstract * * column 7, line 22 - line 24 * * column 8, line 40 - line 50 * * column 8, line 59 - line 63 *;
 [X]US4243935  (MCCOOL JOHN M, et al) [X] 8-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 2 * * column 5, line 34 - line 63 *;
 [XA]US5274606  (DRUMHELLER DOUGLAS S [US], et al) [X] 8,9,14 * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 14 * [A] 10-13,15-18
International search[Y]US4733233  (GROSSO DONALD S [US], et al);
 [Y]US4520665  (CORDIER BERNARD [FR], et al);
 [Y]US4912683  (KATAHARA KEITH W [US], et al);
 [Y]US5386472  (PFAFF DONALD P [US], et al);
 [Y]US5940519  (KUO SEN M [US]);
 [A]US4208906  (ROBERTS LIONA R JR [US]);
 [Y]US5555503  (KYRTSOS CHRISTOS T [US], et al);
 [T]US5832095  (DANIELS MARK A [US]);
 [A]US4532812  (BIRCHAK JAMES R [US])