Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254544

EP1254544 - EMBEDDED TRAINING SEQUENCES FOR CARRIER ACQUISITION AND TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, SE, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
5300 California Avenue
Irvine, CA 92617 / US
[2007/21]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013
Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JAFFE, Steven, T.
16215 Alton Parkway
Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US
02 / CAMERON, Kelly, B.
16215 Alton Parkway
Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2003/19]Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2002/45]Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date00992832.604.12.2000
[2002/45]
WO2000US42546
Priority number, dateUS19990168808P03.12.1999         Original published format: US 168808 P
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0143310
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254544
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254544
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L27/00, H04L25/02
[2014/50]
Former International [2002/45]H04L27/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:EINGEBETTETE TRAININGSSEQUENZEN FÜR FREQUENZERFASSUNG UND -VERFOLGUNG[2002/45]
English:EMBEDDED TRAINING SEQUENCES FOR CARRIER ACQUISITION AND TRACKING[2002/45]
French:APPRENTISSAGE INTERCALAIRE POUR MODULATION TURBO-CODEE[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2002National basic fee paid 
21.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
08.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2015Fee for grant paid
19.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.11.2006
Opposition(s)01.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
[2017/40]
Former [2016/46]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
LU04.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
LU04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/21]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL29.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0940957  (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP]) [X] 1,10,25,40,57 * abstract * * column 14, line 45 - column 15, line 11; figure 1 * * column 16, line 44 - column 18, line 40 * * column 21, line 40 - column 22, line 58 *;
 [X]US5666378  (MARCHETTO ROBERT F [CA], et al) [X] 1,10,25,40,57 * abstract *
Examination US6452936