Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240605

EP1240605 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AND DISPLAYING WEB-BASED PRODUCT OFFERINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2012
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2012Change - applicantpublished on 18.07.2012  [2012/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A9.COM, INC.
130 Lytton Avenue, Suite 300
Palo Alto, CA 94301-1044 / US
[2012/29]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Amazon.Com, Inc.
Suite 1200, 1200 12th Avenue South
Seattle, WA 98144 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAILEY, David, R.
3065 N.E. 178th Street
Lake Forest Park, WA 98155 / US
02 / FELDMAN, Todd, J.
6355 Beach Drive S.W.
Seattle, WA 98136 / US
03 / RAJARAMAN, Anand
601 39th Avenue E.
Seattle, WA 98112 / US
04 / FORD, James, L.
2119 104th Place S.E.
Bellevue, WA 98004 / US
05 / SCOFIELD, Christopher, L.
2557 25th Avenue E.
Seattle, WA 98112 / US
06 / BOWMAN, Dwayne, E.
14244 214th Way N.E.
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
07 / ORTEGA, Ruben, E.
7019 24th Avenue N.E.
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2012/14]
Former [2004/41]Fennell, Gareth Charles
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2002/38]Potter, Julian Mark , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00992854.007.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US42645
Priority number, dateUS19990169570P08.12.1999         Original published format: US 169570 P
US2000052812717.03.2000         Original published format: US 528127
US2000052813817.03.2000         Original published format: US 528138
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146870
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240605
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F17/60, G06F13/00
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ORTEN UND ANZEIGEN VON INTERNETBASIERTEN PRODUKTANGEBOTEN[2002/38]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AND DISPLAYING WEB-BASED PRODUCT OFFERINGS[2002/38]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA LOCALISATION ET LA PRESENTATION D'OFFRES DE PRODUITS ACCESSIBLES SUR INTERNET[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2002National basic fee paid 
05.07.2002Search fee paid 
05.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
08.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/25]
14.05.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2012
25.06.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9819259  (IPF INC [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 57, paragraph L - page 62, paragraph L *;
 [X]US5963915  (KIRSCH STEVEN T [US]) [X] 1-21 * column 7, line 20 - line 42 * * column 11, line 16 - line 38 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]EP0866408  (FOERETAGSANDAN SWEDEN AB [SE]) [X] 1-21 * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 40 *
 [X]  - KELLER A M, "Smart catalogs and virtual catalogs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX WORKSHOP OF ELECTRONIC COMMERCE, (19950711), pages 125 - 131, XP002086428 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 125, column R, paragraph L * * page 127, column R, paragraph L - page 129, column L, paragraph 1 *
 [X]  - SCHWARTZ S, "ORDERING IT RIGHT THE FIRST TIME: THE UPC ELECTRONIC CATALOG AND EDI", EDI FORUM, EDI GROUP, OAK PARK, IL, US, (1992), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1048-3047, pages 58 - 62, XP001055246 [X] 1-21 * page 59, column 2, paragraph L - page 61, column 3, paragraph L *
International search[YP]US6014664  (FAGIN RONALD [US], et al);
 [YP]US6073135  (BRODER ANDREI Z [US], et al);
 [YP]US6009459  (BELFIORE JOSEPH D [US], et al);
 [Y]US5918214  (PERKOWSKI THOMAS J [US]);
 [Y]US5913210  (CALL CHARLES G [US]);
 [Y]GB2331166  (IBM [US])