Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1261704

EP1261704 - ISOLATED NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING CANCER ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS, THE ANTIGENS PER SE, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH
605 Third Avenue
New York
New York 10158 / US
For all designated states
MEMORIAL SLOAN-KETTERING CANCER CENTER
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
For all designated states
CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION
20 Thornwood Drive
Ithaca, NY 11850 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]For all designated states
LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH
605 Third Avenue New York
New York 10158 / US
For all designated states
MEMORIAL SLOAN-KETTERING CANCER CENTER
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
For all designated states
CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION
20 Thornwood Drive
Ithaca, NY 11850 / US
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH
605 Third Avenue
New York, New York 10158 / US
For all designated states
MEMORIAL SLOAN-KETTERING CANCER CENTER
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
For all designated states
CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION
20 Thornwood Drive
Ithaca, NY 11850 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JAGER, Dirk
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
02 / STOCKERT, Elisabeth
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
03 / SCANLAN, Matthew
Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research, Room K-813
425 East 68th Street, New York NY10021 / US
04 / KNUTH, Alexander
Steinbacher Hohl 2-28
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
05 / OLD, Lloyd
605 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10158 / US
06 / GURE, Ali
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
07 / CHEN, Yao-Tseng
525 East 68th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
08 / JÄGER, Elke
Steinbacher Hohl 2-28
60488 Frankfurt Am Main / DE
 [2007/29]
Former [2003/18]01 / JAGER, Dirk
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
02 / STOCKERT, Elisabeth
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
03 / SCANLAN, Matthew
Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research, Room K-813
425 East 68th Street, New York NY10021 / US
04 / KNUTH, Alexander
Steinbacher Hohl 2-28
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
05 / OLD, Lloyd
605 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10158 / US
06 / GURE, Ali
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
07 / CHEN, Yao-Tseng
525 East 68th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
Former [2002/49]01 / JAGER, Dirk
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
02 / STOCKERT, Elisabeth
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
03 / SCANLAN, Matthew
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
04 / KNUTH, Alexander
Steinbacher Hohl 2-28
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
05 / OLD, Lloyd
605 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10158 / US
06 / GURE, Ali
1275 York Avenue
New York, NY 10021 / US
07 / CHEN, Yao-Tseng
525 East 68th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
Representative(s)Williams, Richard Andrew Norman , et al
HGF Limited
140 London Wall
London EC2Y 5DN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/46]Williams, Richard Andrew Norman , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JA / GB
Former [2002/49]Harrison Goddard Foote
31 St Saviourgate
York Y01 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date00993009.029.11.2000
[2002/49]
WO2000US42334
Priority number, dateUS1999045173930.11.1999         Original published format: US 451739
US2000060236222.06.2000         Original published format: US 602362
[2002/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0147959
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1261704
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1261704
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C12N5/10, C07K16/30, A61K48/00, A61K39/00, G01N33/50, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68
[2002/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/49]
TitleGerman:ISOLIERTE, FÜR KREBS-ASSOZIIERTE ANTIGENE KODIERENDE NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE, DIE ANTIGENE PER SE UND DEREN ANWENDUNGEN[2002/49]
English:ISOLATED NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING CANCER ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS, THE ANTIGENS PER SE, AND USES THEREOF[2002/49]
French:MOLECULES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ISOLES CODANT POUR DES ANTIGENES ASSOCIES AU CANCERS, CES ANTIGENES ET LEUR UTILISATION[2002/49]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2002National basic fee paid 
07.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
03.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2009Fee for grant paid
14.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23]
Request for further processing for:02.11.2007Request for further processing filed
02.11.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.11.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
16.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY01.07.2009
DK01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
IT01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
TR01.07.2009
GR02.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
LU29.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/21]DK01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
IT01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
GR02.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
LU29.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/14]DK01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
IT01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
GR02.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/47]DK01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
GR02.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/30]DK01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/20]DK01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
Former [2010/16]FI01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
Former [2010/09]FI01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
ES12.10.2009
Former [2010/08]SE01.07.2009
ES12.10.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9721809  (UNIV TECHNOLOGIES INT [CA]) [X] 1,2,10-13,18,25,30,38-41,61,62,64-67,81,83 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9423728  (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]) [A] * abstract, page 4,14-15, Example 2 *;
 [A]WO9904265  (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al) [A] * example 10 *;
 [PX]WO0060076  (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,6,8-13,19,30,32-41,43-50,65-67,69,75-77,79,81-83 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO0175171  (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [E] 1,6,8-13,40,49,50,65,67,69,75-77,81,82,86 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO0073801  (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al) [E] 82,83,86 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO0136476  (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [E] 83 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - SAITO, A. ,ET AL., "Homo sapiens mRNA for p33, complete cds. - p24/ING1-ALT1 and p47/ING1-ALT2, distinct alternative transcripts of p33/ING1", DATABASE EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, XP002190254 [X] 1-4,81-83 * accession no. AB024401 *
 [X]  - MA, D., ET AL., "Sequence conservation of ING1 splicing isoforms in divergent species - Homo sapiens p33ING1b (ING1) mRNA, complete cds", DATABASE EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, XP002190255 [X] 1-4,81,82 * accession no. AF181850 *
 [X]  - GARKATSEV, I.A., ET AL./JAEGER, D. ETAL., "candidate tumour suppressor P33ING1, variant A", DATABASE TREMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, XP002190256 [X] 83 * accession no. O43658 *
 [DX]  - GARKAVTSEV I ET AL, "SUPPRESSION OF THE NOVEL GROWTH INHIBITOR P33ING1 PROMOTES NEOPLASTIC TRANSFORMATION", NATURE GENETICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199612), vol. 14, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 415 - 420, XP002948506 [DX] 83 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1296-415
 [X]  - NCI-CGAP, "National Cancer Institute, Cancer Genome Anatomy Project (CGAP), Tumor Gene Index http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/ncicgap - xj36a10.x1 Soares_NFL_T_GBC_S1 Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:2659290 3', mRNA sequence", DATABASE EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, XP002190257 [X] 82 * accession no. AW170035 *
 [X]  - DU, H., ET AL., "The sequence of Homo sapiens PAC clone RP5-1048B16 - Homo sapiens PAC clone RP5-1048B16 from 7q34-q36, complete sequence", DATABASE EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, XP002190258 [X] 1 * accession no. AC006019 *
 [A]  - TURECI O ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF SSX GENES IN HUMAN TUMORS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1998), vol. 77, no. 1, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 19 - 23, XP000916544 [A] * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19980703)77:1<19::AID-IJC4>3.0.CO;2-2
 [A]  - TURECI O ET AL, "SEROLOGICAL ANALYSIS OF HUMAN TUMOR ANTIGENS: MOLECULAR DEFINITION AND IMPLICATIONS", MOLECULAR MEDICINE TODAY, ELSEVIER, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (199708), vol. 3, no. 8, ISSN 1357-4310, pages 342 - 349, XP000985587 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1357-4310(97)01081-2
 [A]  - GURE A O ET AL, "SSX: A MULTIGENE FAMILY WITH SEVERAL MEMBERS TRANSCRIBED IN NORMAL TESTIS AND HUMAN CANCER", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1997), vol. 72, no. 6, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 965 - 971, XP000916549

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19970917)72:6<965::AID-IJC8>3.0.CO;2-N
 [A]  - CHEN ET AL, "Identification of multiple cancer/testis antigens by allogenic antibody screening of a melanoma cell line library", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199806), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6919 - 6923, XP002132946 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.12.6919
 [DA]  - SCANLAN ET AL, "Characterization of human colon cancer antigens recognized by autologous antibodies", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980529), vol. 76, no. 5, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 652 - 658, XP002103186 [DA] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19980529)76:5<652::AID-IJC7>3.0.CO;2-P
 [PX]  - SAITO A ET AL, "P24/ING1-ALT1 AND P47/ING1-ALT2, DISTINCT ALTERNATIVE TRANSCRIPTS PF P33/ING1", JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, XX, XX, (2000), vol. 45, pages 177 - 181, XP000982381 [PX] 1,2,40,81,82 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s100380050206
 [PX]  - JAEGER D ET AL, "CANCER-TESTIS ANTIGENS AND ING1 TUMOR SUPPRESSOR GENE PRODUCT ARE BREAST CANCER ANTIGENS: CHARACTERIZATION OF TISSUE-SPECIFIC ING1 TRANSCRIPTS AND A HOMOLOGUE GENE", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19991215), vol. 59, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6197 - 6204, XP000986298 [PX] 1,5,40,43,49,50,69,75,76,81-83 * the whole document *
 [T]  - JAGER DIRK ET AL, "Identification of a tissue-specific putative transcription factor in breast tissue by serological screening of a breast cancer library.", CANCER RESEARCH, (20010301), vol. 61, no. 5, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2055 - 2061, XP001053562
by applicantUS5698396
    - VAN DER BRUGGEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1643 - 1647,
    - BRICHARD ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1993), vol. 178, pages 489 - 495,
    - COULIE ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 180, pages 35 - 42,
    - KAWAKAMI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3515 - 3519,
    - OETTGEN ET AL., IMMUNOL. ALLERG. CLIN. NORTH. AM., (1990), vol. 10, pages 607 - 637,
    - CHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 1914 - 1918,
    - GÜRE ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, pages 1034 - 1041,
    - SAHIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 11810 - 11813,
    - TURECI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, pages 4766 - 4772,
 US19970948705