Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240713

EP1240713 - COMBUSTION CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.03.2006  [2006/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CAPSTONE TURBINE CORPORATION
21211 Nordhoff Street Chatsworth
California 91311 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Capstone Turbine Corporation
21211 Nordhoff Street
Chatsworth, California 91311 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GILBRETH, Mark, G.
21211 Nordhoff Street
Chatsworth, CA 91311 / US
02 / WALL, Simon, R.
21211 Nordhoff Street
Chatsworth, CA 91311 / US
03 / WACKNOV, Joel, B.
21211 Nordhoff Street
Chatsworth, CA 91311 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Milhench, Howard Leslie , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Milhench, Howard Leslie , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date00993077.713.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US33838
Priority number, dateUS1999045971913.12.1999         Original published format: US 459719
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0158004
Date:09.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240713
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H02P9/30
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBRENNUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM[2002/38]
English:COMBUSTION CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM[2002/38]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE LA COMBUSTION[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2002National basic fee paid 
10.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
13.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/10]
06.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/10]
Request for further processing for:01.12.2003Request for further processing filed
01.12.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.12.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9952193  (CAPSTONE TURBINE CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 6-8,18,19,23;
 [XA]EP0901218  (CAPSTONE TURBINE CORP [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 18,23;
 [A]US5903116  (GEIS EVERETT R [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract *;
 [A]US4414804  (MENARD CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1,9,10,13,18,23 * abstract *