Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242313

EP1242313 - WASTE WATER TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2010
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 16.02.2011  [2011/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NUKEM Technologies GmbH
Industriestrasse 13
63755 Alzenau / DE
[2009/25]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
RWE Nukem Corporation
3800 Fernandina Road, Suite 200
Columbia, SC 29210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROSENBERGER, Stefan
c/o RWE NUKEM GmbH Industriestrasse 13
63754 Alzenau / DE
02 / WHITEHEAD, Howard
57 View Point Circle
Saint Helena Island South Carolina 29920 / US
03 / WILSON, James, H.
313 Clearview Drive
Columbia, SC 29212 / US
04 / UNDERWOOD, Randall, B.
179 Cornerstone Lane
Lexington, SC 29073 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00993091.827.10.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US41663
Priority number, dateUS19990161853P27.10.1999         Original published format: US 161853 P
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0144115
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1242313
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242313
Date:06.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.05.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/42, B01D61/14, C02F1/44
[2003/33]
Former International [2002/39]C02F1/42
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANLAGE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABWASSER[2002/39]
English:WASTE WATER TREATMENT SYSTEM[2002/39]
French:SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT D'EAUX USEES[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2002National basic fee paid 
27.05.2002Search fee paid 
27.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
03.11.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2009Fee for grant paid
13.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200708   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.01.2010
BE06.01.2010
CY06.01.2010
DK06.01.2010
FI06.01.2010
NL06.01.2010
SE06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
ES17.04.2010
PT06.05.2010
[2011/07]
Former [2010/49]AT06.01.2010
BE06.01.2010
CY06.01.2010
FI06.01.2010
NL06.01.2010
SE06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
ES17.04.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2010/47]AT06.01.2010
BE06.01.2010
CY06.01.2010
FI06.01.2010
NL06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
ES17.04.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2010/38]AT06.01.2010
FI06.01.2010
NL06.01.2010
ES17.04.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2010/35]AT06.01.2010
NL06.01.2010
ES17.04.2010
PT06.05.2010
Former [2010/32]AT06.01.2010
ES17.04.2010
Former [2010/30]AT06.01.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]CH673957  (BUCHER GUYER AG MASCH) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 3, column 1, line 53 - page 3, column 2, line 40; figure .; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US4865726  (DE VRIES ISSE [NL]) [A] 1,9,13 * figure 1; claim 1 *
International search[X]US4276177  (SMITH VERITY C);
 [X]US4820426  (PFERTZEL ROGER [FR], et al);
 [X]US5585531  (BARKER TRACY A [US], et al);
 [Y]US4983302  (BALINT TIBOR [HU], et al);
 [Y]US4978506  (CALDERWOOD ANDREW S [US]);
 [Y]JPH07961  (TOSHIBA CORP)