Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237873

EP1237873 - CONTROL OF ARTHROPODS IN ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merial Limited
3239 Satellite Blvd
Duluth, GA 30096-4640 / US
[2007/31]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Bayer CropScience S.A.
55 avenue Rene Cassin
69009 Lyon / FR
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A.
55, avenue René Cassin
69009 Lyon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / HUBER, Scot, Kevin
6104 Bramblewood Drive
Raleigh, NC 27612 / US
02 / CHOU, David, Teh-Wei
5120 Richland Drive
Raleigh, NC 27612 / US
03 / SCHNATTERER, Stefan
Schillerring 10
65795 Hattersheim / DE
04 / BASTIAANS, Henricus, Maria, Martinus
Stockheimer Weg 9a
61250 Usingen / DE
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Clyde-Watson, Zöe , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]Clyde-Watson, Zöe , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2007/23]Clyde-Watson, Zöe , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2005/43]Lutze, Oliver , et al
Bayer CropScience AG Law & Patents Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee Building Q 18
51373 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2002/38]Rippel, Hans Christoph, Dr. , et al
Bayer CropScience GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 801
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2002/37]Rippel, Hans Christoph, Dr. , et al
Aventis CropScience GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 801
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date00993256.701.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000EP12100
Priority number, dateUS19990168658P02.12.1999         Original published format: US 168658 P
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0140195
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237873
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1237873
Date:03.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D231/28, A61K31/4152, A61K31/415
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:BEKÄMPFUNG VON ARTHROPODEN IN TIEREN[2002/37]
English:CONTROL OF ARTHROPODS IN ANIMALS[2002/37]
French:CONTROLE DES ARTHROPODES CHEZ LES ANIMAUX[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2002National basic fee paid 
02.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
03.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2013Fee for grant paid
21.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.02.2004
Opposition(s)06.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11]
Request for further processing for:03.12.2004Request for further processing filed
03.12.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.12.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
GR04.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
IE01.12.2013
LU01.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/48]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
GR04.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
IE01.12.2013
LU01.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
GR04.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
LU01.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
GR04.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
LU01.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
GR04.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
GR04.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
GR04.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/47]PT05.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0385809  (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1,7,9-12 * page 30, line 5 - line 8; example -; claim 1 * * page 30, line 13 - line 14 * * page 33, line 38 - page 34, line 4 *;
 [X]US5047550  (D SILVA THEMISTOCLES D J [US]) [X] 3-8,11 * example 1H; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]WO9712521  (RHONE MERIEUX [FR], et al) [X] 1,7-12 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0249033  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 7,11 * page 44, line 12; examples 2,7,9,12,16,17; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0257296  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 7,11 * examples I-7,I-8,I-10,I-62,I-63; claim 1; table 2 *;
 JP2000169453  [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP);
 [X]EP0469357  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 7,11 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - OKADA, ITARU ET AL, "Preparation of 1-phenylpyrazole-3-carboxamides as fungicides", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 133:30728, URL: STN, XP002172128 [X] 7,11 * abstract *