Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235895

EP1235895 - USE OF POLYMERIC MATERIAL IN THE TREATMENT OF HARD SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2015Revocation of patentpublished on 08.04.2015  [2015/15]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2008/13]For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2002/36]For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever Plc
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ASHCROFT, A.T., Unilever Research Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East, Bebington
Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
02 / CARVELL, Melvin, Unilever Research Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East, Bebington
Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
03 / HUMPREYS, K.M., Unilever Research Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East, Bebington
Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
04 / KHOSDEL, Ezat, Unilever Research Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East, Bebington
Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
05 / LIU, Xiang, Yang, National University of Singapore
Dept of Physics, 10 Kent Ridge Crescent
119260 Singapore / SG
06 / RANNARD, Steven, Unilever Research Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East, Bebington
Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
07 / WALLER, Andrew Mark, Unilever NV
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Corsten, Michael Allan
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[2014/41]
Former [2009/29]Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M. , et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2006/16]Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M. , et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2006/03]Dekker, Enno Ernst Jan , et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2002/36]Dekker, Enno E. J. , et al
Unilever N.V., Patent Department, Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date00993324.324.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000EP11819
Priority number, dateEP1999030988408.12.1999         Original published format: EP 99309884
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0142415
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235895
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235895
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/37, C11D3/22
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON POLYMEREM MATERIAL ZUR BEHANDLUNG HARTER OBERFLÄCHEN[2002/36]
English:USE OF POLYMERIC MATERIAL IN THE TREATMENT OF HARD SURFACES[2002/36]
French:UTILISATION DE MATIERE POLYMERE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES DURES[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2002National basic fee paid 
24.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
29.08.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
03.03.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
24.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2008Fee for grant paid
10.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.12.2008  14.01.2009  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2009/08]
Opponent(s)01  24.12.2008  14.01.2009  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London
EC2M 7LH / GB
03.02.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.07.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.06.2011Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.07.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.12.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
16.12.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/15]
10.02.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.09.2011Appeal received No.  T2080/11
23.11.2011Statement of grounds filed
16.12.2014Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
16.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
TR26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
GR27.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
IE24.11.2008
LU24.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/37]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
TR26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
IE24.11.2008
LU24.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/32]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
IE24.11.2008
LU24.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/49]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
IE24.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/47]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
IE24.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/42]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/29]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/08]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2009/01]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2008/49]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2008/46]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
Former [2008/43]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
Former [2008/39]AT26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9960086  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,4-10 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 5 * * page 14, paragraphs 4,5 * * page 16, paragraph 1 - page 18, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 36, paragraph 4 - page 39, paragraph 1 * [A] 2,3,12;
 [XA]EP0875555  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,4,7-10,12 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 1 * * examples * * claims 1,6 * [A] 2,3;
 [A]EP0635567  (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3679592  (SCHOMBURG NOEL L) [A] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9426858  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,5-10,12 * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 27 * * examples 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0342997  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,5-12 * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 6 * * examples 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0843003  (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5-10,12 * page 9, lines 2-57 *