Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240675

EP1240675 - INTERMEDIATE PRODUCT FOR PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/38]PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT
[2010/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2011
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EPCOS AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2003/33]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
EPCOS AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81541 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FELTZ, Adalbert
Burgeggerstrasse 50
A-8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT
02 / GANSBERGER, Sigrid
Eisteichgasse 29 a
A-8010 Graz / AT
03 / FLORIAN, Heinz
Klunkererberg 79
A-8524 Bad Gams / AT
04 / KASTL, Harald
Bad Gams 83
A-8524 Bad Gams / AT
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Epping Hermann & Fischer
Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date00993455.515.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000DE04484
Priority number, dateDE199916084916.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19960849
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0145138
Date:21.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240675
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240675
Date:15.09.2010
Language:DE
[2010/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/083
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZWISCHENPRODUKT FÜR EIN PIEZOELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT[2010/17]
English:INTERMEDIATE PRODUCT FOR PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT[2010/17]
French:PRODUIT INTERMEDIAIRE POUR COMPOSANT PIEZOELECTRIQUE[2010/17]
Former [2002/38]PIEZOELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT
Former [2002/38]PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT
Former [2002/38]COMPOSANT PIEZOELECTRIQUE
Entry into regional phase11.07.2002National basic fee paid 
11.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
24.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.03.2010
25.03.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2010Fee for grant paid
30.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10176030.4  / EP2278634
Opposition(s)16.06.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
TR15.09.2010
LU15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
LU15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/48]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/45]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/36]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/31]CY15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/24]CY15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/19]CY15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
Former [2011/15]CY15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
Former [2011/13]CY15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
Former [2011/10]FI15.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH04324687  ;
 JPH04324687  [ ] (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD);
 [XA]JPH04171990  ;
 []JPH04171990  (TOTO LTD, et al) [ ] * the whole document *;
 [XA]US4755493  (TAKEUCHI YUKIHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 8-11,16,19,22;
 [A]US5433917  (SRIVASTAVA ASHVIN [US], et al) [A] 1,7-12,17,18 * column 1, line 14 - line 50 * * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 28 *;
 [A]DE19916380  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1,7-12,17,18 * page 2, line 68 - page 3, line 34; examples 3,4 *;
 [DA]US5648012  (HIGASHIBEPPU MAKOTO [JP], et al) [DA] 7-16 * column 1, line 19 - column 4, line 6 *;
 [A]US4353958  (KITA KATSUHIKO, et al) [A] 3 * abstract *;
 [E]WO0124287  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [E] 1 * page 3 - page 6 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930330), vol. 017, no. 165, Database accession no. (E - 1343), [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * [Y] 19,20,22
 [Y]  - HIRAKATA K ET AL, "Multilayer capacitors with copper inner electrodes", FERROELECTRICS, (1992), vol. 133, no. 1-4, ISSN 0015-0193, pages 139 - 144, XP001010835 [Y] 19,20,22 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921005), vol. 016, no. 478, Database accession no. (E - 1274), [X] 1,7-11,16 * abstract * [A] 19
 [X]  - NAGATA K, "Properties of piezoelectric ceramics sintered in reducing atmosphere", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1 (REGULAR PAPERS & SHORT NOTES), (199109), vol. 30, no. 9B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 2224 - 2227, XP000269860 [X] 1,2,7-11,16 * page 2224 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.30.2224