Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238464

EP1238464 - DUPLEXER WITH IMPROVED TRANSMISSION/RECEIVING BAND SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EPCOS AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / MACHUI, Jürgen
Nadistr. 35
80809 München / DE
 [2002/43]
Former [2002/37]01 / MACHUI, Jürgen
Strassbergerstrasse 103
80809 München / DE
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Epping Hermann & Fischer
Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date00993470.406.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000DE04344
Priority number, dateDE199916029914.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19960299
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0145273
Date:21.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238464
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/00
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2004/22]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:DUPLEXER MIT VERBESSERTER SENDE-/EMPFANGSBANDTRENNUNG[2002/37]
English:DUPLEXER WITH IMPROVED TRANSMISSION/RECEIVING BAND SEPARATION[2002/37]
French:COMMUTATEUR EMISSION/RECEPTION AYANT UNE SEPARATION EMISSION/RECEPTION AMELIOREE[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2002National basic fee paid 
23.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/01]
04.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5963856  (KIM H H [US]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 4 * * column 3, line 39 - column 6, line 11 * * figure 2A * * figure 4 *;
 [X]US5915212  (PRZELOMIEC THOMAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 4, line 6 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 64 * * figure 4 *;
 [X]US4980660  (NAKAMURA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 56 *