Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242007

EP1242007 - METHODS OF SURFACE TREATMENT FOR ENHANCING THE PERFORMANCE OF A FLOATING PHAKIC REFRACTIVE INTRAOCULAR LENS DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/39]METHODS OF SURFACE TREATMENT FOR ENHANCING THE PERFORMANCE OF A FLOATING PHAKIC REFRACTIVE LENS DESIGN
[2006/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.10.2009
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 11.08.2010  [2010/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IOLTECH
10 Avenue Paul Langevin
17180 Perigny / FR
[2004/46]
Former [2004/45]For all designated states
IOLTECH SA
Avenue Paul Langevin
17000 La Rochelle / FR
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Medennium, Inc.
15350 Barranca Parkway
Irvine, CA 92618 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VALYUNIN, Igor
69 Fleurance Street
Laguna Miguel, CA 92677-9021 / US
02 / WILCOX, Christopher, D.
25161 Campina Drive
Mission Viejo, CA 92691-5411 / US
03 / ZHOU, Stephen, Q.
11 Suncreek
Irvine, CA 92604-4619 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Lewitter, Herbert
Santarelli
12 avenue de la Grande-Armée
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/42]Lewitter, Herbert
Santarelli Cabinet de Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 14, Avenue de la Grande-Armée B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2003/39](deleted)
...
Former [2002/39]Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00993584.221.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US34952
Priority number, dateUS19990173894P29.12.1999         Original published format: US 173894 P
US2000073807215.12.2000         Original published format: US 738072
[2007/14]
Former [2002/39]US19990173894P29.12.1999
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0147437
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242007
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242007
Date:17.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/16, B29D11/02
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SCHWIMMEIGENSCHAFTEN EINER PHAKEN REFRAKTÄREN INTRAOKULAR LINSE[2006/47]
English:METHODS OF SURFACE TREATMENT FOR ENHANCING THE PERFORMANCE OF A FLOATING PHAKIC REFRACTIVE INTRAOCULAR LENS DESIGN[2006/47]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LES RESULTATS D'UNE CONCEPTION DE LENTILLE INTRAOCULAIRE DE REFRACTION PHAKIQUE FLOTTANTE[2006/47]
Former [2002/39]VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG BEI EINER SCHWIMMENDEN PHAKISCHEN, LICHTBRECHENDEN LINSE
Former [2002/39]METHODS OF SURFACE TREATMENT FOR ENHANCING THE PERFORMANCE OF A FLOATING PHAKIC REFRACTIVE LENS DESIGN
Former [2002/39]PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LES RESULTATS D'UNE CONCEPTION DE LENTILLE DE REFRACTION PHAKIQUE FLOTTANTE
Entry into regional phase04.06.2002National basic fee paid 
04.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/35]
10.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
13.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/21]
29.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/35]
02.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2007Fee for grant paid
19.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)18.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48]
Request for further processing for:18.07.2005Request for further processing filed
18.07.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.03.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU21.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
[2010/32]
Former [2009/34]MC31.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[DXAY]WO9817205  (INT VISION INC [US]) [DX] 6,15-20,24-26,30,31 * page 5, line 5 - line 18; figure - * * page 6, paragraph 1 * [A] 32-36 [Y] 7,14,21,27;
 [Y]US4424597  (SCHLEGEL HANS-JOACHIM [DE]) [Y] 7,21,27 * claim 1 *;
 [YA]US6007747  (BLAKE LARRY W [US], et al) [Y] 14 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 15; figure - * [A] 1,4,5,32,35,36;
 [PX]US6152958  (NORDAN LEE T [US]) [PX] 6,11,15-19 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 6; figure - * * column 2, line 34 - line 43 *;
 [A]US4740282  (GESSER HYMAN D [CA], et al) [A] 1-5,10-14 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO0147437
by applicantUS4585456
 US5480428
 US5258025
 WO9817205
 US5192319
 US5300117
 US5397848
 RU2032544