Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254495

EP1254495 - APPARATUS FOR FIXING SWITCHING DEVICES ON MOUNTING RAILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/45]DEVICE FOR FIXING SWITCHGEARS ON MOUNTING RAILS
[2005/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moeller GmbH
Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11
53115 Bonn / DE
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHLIEBER, Simone
Franzstr. 3
53111 Bonn / DE
 [2002/45]
Application number, filing date00993828.306.12.2000
[2002/45]
WO2000EP12270
Priority number, dateDE200010581810.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10005818
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0159898
Date:16.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254495
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254495
Date:21.09.2005
Language:DE
[2005/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02B1/056
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI [2004/21]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON SCHALTGERÄTEN AUF TRAGSCHIENEN[2002/45]
English:APPARATUS FOR FIXING SWITCHING DEVICES ON MOUNTING RAILS[2005/29]
French:DISPOSITION DE FIXATION D'APPAREILLAGES DE COMMUTATION SUR DES PROFILS SUPPORTS[2005/38]
Former [2002/45]DEVICE FOR FIXING SWITCHGEARS ON MOUNTING RAILS
Former [2002/45]DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'APPAREILS DE COMMUTATION SUR DES PROFILES SUPPORTS
Entry into regional phase29.06.2002National basic fee paid 
29.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
01.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2005Fee for grant paid
12.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]DE19515923  (WOEHNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 15 - line 60 *;
 [A]DE7318411U  (ALBRECHT JUNG GMBH) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 *