Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243410

EP1243410 - Method of making a heat-sensitive lithographic printing plate precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Vermeersch, Joan
c/o AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800
2640, Mortsel / BE
 [2002/39]
Application number, filing date01000059.420.03.2001
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243410
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B41C1/10
[2002/39]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/24]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines wärmeempfindlichen Vorläufers für eine Flachdruckplatte[2002/39]
English:Method of making a heat-sensitive lithographic printing plate precursor[2002/39]
French:Méthode pour la fabrication d'un précurseur thermosensible pour une plaque lithographique[2002/39]
Examination procedure26.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/01]
23.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.05.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.05.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1080884  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 29 - line 32 * * page 3, line 53 - line 56 * * claims 1,2,6 *;
 [X]EP0881096  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 34 - line 52 * * page 6, line 39 - line 56 * * claims 1,9,10 *;
 [X]EP0839647  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 5 - line 19 * * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 9 * * claims 1,4-6,9 *;
 [X]EP0773113  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 20 * * column 5, line 29 - line 55 * * claims 1,6-8 *;
 [X]EP0773112  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 14 - line 46 * * column 6, line 3 - line 25 * * claims 1,6,10-14 *;
 [X]EP0770497  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,6,8 * * column 7, line 28 - line 50 *