Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161029

EP1161029 - Managing system resources [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SWEITZER, John W. (US Resident)
c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Proper
SO21 2JN, Winchester / GB
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Burt, Roger James , et al
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Burt, Roger James, Dr. , et al
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date01000138.603.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateUS2000058371031.05.2000         Original published format: US 583710
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161029
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/49]
TitleGerman:Verwatlung von System-Betriebsmitteln[2001/49]
English:Managing system resources[2001/49]
French:Gestion des resources de système[2001/49]
Examination procedure29.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/27]
23.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/42]
10.05.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5796951  (HAMNER JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1,9,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - line 67 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 24 * * column 7, line 4 - line 40 * * figure 5 *;
 [X]  SHEN C-C ET AL, "THE NETWORK AS DISTRIBUTED OBJECT DATABASE", NOMS '98. 1998 IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM. NEW ORLEANS, LA, FEBR. 15 - 20. 1998, IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (19980215), vol. 2 CONF. 10, ISBN 0-7803-4352-2, pages 540 - 548, XP000799525 [X] 1,9,12 * abstract * * page 542, line 14 - line 19 *