Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1116767

EP1116767 - Electrochromic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Innovation GmbH
Merowingerplatz 1
40225 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/10]For all designated states
Bayer Innovation GmbH
Merowingerplatz 1
40225 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
Bayer Chemicals AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2001/29]For all designated states
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Berneth, Horst, Dr.
Erfurter Strasse 1
51373 Leverkusen / DE
02 / Hünig, Siegfried, Prof. Dr.
Mittlerer Neubergweg 15
97074 Würzburg / DE
03 / Briehn, Christoph Alexander
Pfarrer-Imhoff-Strasse 8/1
89134 Blaustein / DE
04 / Aldenkortt, Sven, Dr.
Pilziggrund Strasse 54
97076 Würzburg / DE
 [2001/29]
Application number, filing date01100004.903.01.2001
[2001/29]
Priority number, dateDE200010103113.01.2000         Original published format: DE 10001031
[2001/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1116767
Date:18.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1116767
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1116767
Date:14.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09K9/02, G02F1/15, C09K11/06, H05B33/14, H05B33/20, C07D417/00
[2001/50]
Former International [2001/29]C09K9/02, G02F1/15
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/29]
TitleGerman:Elektrochrome Vorrichtung[2001/29]
English:Electrochromic device[2001/29]
French:Dispositif électrochrome[2001/29]
Examination procedure12.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
10.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2006Fee for grant paid
27.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9730135  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-23; claims 1-13 *;
 [X]WO9730134  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-28; claims 1-17 *;
 [X]WO9805737  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-16; claims 1-13 *