Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1180712

EP1180712 - Fixtures and fitting structure for eyeglass lens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fur Seal Company, Limited
38-5-8, Sugimoto-cho Sabae-shi
Fukui 916-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/08]For all designated states
Fur Seal Company, Limited
38-5-8, Sugimoto-cho
Sabae-shi, Fukui 916-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Tsuyoshi, Fur Seal Company, Limited
38-5-8, Sugimoto-cho
Sabae-shi, Fukui 916-0005 / JP
 [2002/08]
Representative(s)Kehl, Günther
Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr
Patentanwälte
Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/08]Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01100262.303.01.2001
[2002/08]
Priority number, dateJP2000024433611.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000244336
[2002/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1180712
Date:20.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02C1/02
[2002/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2002/45]
Former [2002/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Montagestruktur für Brillenglas[2002/08]
English:Fixtures and fitting structure for eyeglass lens[2002/08]
French:Structure de montage pour lentille de lunette[2002/08]
Examination procedure01.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/41]
02.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/06]
06.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0621497  (NITTO SEIKO KK) [A] 1-6 * claim - *;
 [A]US6007200  (TACHIBANA HIDEAKI) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 29 *;
 [A]EP0666490  (KOBAYASHI MITSUO) [A] 1-6 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0601849  (KORI YUKIKO ;TAKEDA KINJI (JP)) [A] 1-6 * claim - *